Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0726768
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
23.03.2001 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 09.05.2001 [2001/19] |
31.03.2000 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 17.05.2000 [2000/20] |
22.02.2000 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
03.12.1999 |
Change - applicant |
published on 19.01.2000 [2000/03] |
16.11.1999 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
16.11.1999 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
13.10.1999 |
Renewal fee |
|
05.07.1999 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
02.07.1999 |
Change - German title |
published on 18.08.1999 [1999/33] |
14.10.1998 |
Renewal fee |
|
03.08.1998 |
Examination report or reply |
|
21.07.1998 |
Examination report or reply |
|
20.02.1998 |
First examination report |
|
16.02.1998 |
Examination report or reply |
|
18.10.1997 |
Renewal fee |
|
18.10.1996 |
Renewal fee |
|
05.07.1996 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 21.08.1996 [1996/34] |
05.07.1996 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 21.08.1996 [1996/34] |
11.06.1996 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
05.06.1996 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|