EP0726768 - USE OF NITRIC OXIDE RELEASING COMPOUNDS FOR THE MANUFACTURE OF A MEDICAMENT FOR PROTECTION IN ISCHEMIA REPERFUSION INJURY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1996/34] | USE OF NITRIC OXIDE RELEASING COMPOUNDS AS PROTECTIVE AGENTS IN ISCHEMIA REPERFUSION INJURY | ||
[1999/33] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.03.2001 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.03.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.05.2001 [2001/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, represented by THE SECRETARY, Department of Health and Human Services National Institutes of Health, Office of Technology Transfer, Box OTT Bethesda, MD 20892-9902 / US | For all designated states BOARD OF SUPERVISORS OF LOUISIANA STATE UNIVERSITY AND AGRICULTURAL AND MECHANICAL COLLEGE Office of the Vice Chancellor for Academic Affairs 433 Bolivar Street Room 824 New Orleans, LA 70112 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/03] | For all designated states THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, represented by THE SECRETARY, Department of Health and Human Services National Institutes of Health, Office of Technology Transfer, Box OTT Bethesda, MD 20892-9902 / US | ||
For all designated states BOARD OF SUPERVISORS OF LOUISIANA STATE UNIVERSITY AND AGRICULTURAL AND MECHANICAL COLLEGE Baton Rouge, LA 70893 / US | |||
Former [1996/34] | For all designated states THE GOVERNMENT OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA as represented by the SECRETARY OF THE DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES National Institute of Health, Office of Technology Transfer, Westwood Building, Box OTT Bethesda, MD 20892-9902 / US | ||
For all designated states BOARD OF SUPERVISORS OF LOUISIANA STATE UNIVERSITY AND AGRICULTURAL AND MECHANICAL COLLEGE Baton Rouge, LA 70893 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WINK, David A., Jr. 116 West Magnolia Hagerstown, MD 21742 / US | 02 /
MITCHELL, James B. 10516 Sweepstakes Road Damascus, MD 20872 / US | 03 /
RUSSO, Angelo 5501 Northfield Road Bethesda, MD 20817 / US | 04 /
KRISHNA, Murali C. 15941 Indian Hills Terrace Derwood, MD 20855 / US | 05 /
HANBAUER, Ingeborg 6001 Brookside Drive Chevy Chase, MD 20815 / US | 06 /
GRISHAM, Matthew B. 7628 Tampaway Shreveport, LA 71105 / US | 07 /
GRANGER, Daniel Neil 2108 Chase Wells Shreveport, LA 71118 / US | [1996/34] | Representative(s) | Walton, Seán Malcolm, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/34] | Walton, Seán Malcolm, et al Mewburn Ellis, York House, 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 95900491.2 | 31.10.1994 | [1996/34] | WO1994US12510 | Priority number, date | US19930146610 | 02.11.1993 Original published format: US 146610 | [1996/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9512394 | Date: | 11.05.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0726768 | Date: | 21.08.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.05.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0726768 | Date: | 17.05.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.05.1995 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/13, A61K31/14 | [1996/34] | CPC: |
A61K31/198 (EP,US);
A61K31/13 (EP,US);
A61K31/14 (EP,US);
A61K31/15 (EP,US);
A61P1/00 (EP);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P3/08 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/06 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P7/00 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1996/34] | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG VON STICKSTOFFOXID FREISETZENDEN VERBINDUNGEN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES ARZNEIMITTELS ZUM SCHUTZ GEGEN DIE ISCHÄMISCHEN REPERFUSIONSSCHÄDEN | [1999/33] | English: | USE OF NITRIC OXIDE RELEASING COMPOUNDS FOR THE MANUFACTURE OF A MEDICAMENT FOR PROTECTION IN ISCHEMIA REPERFUSION INJURY | [1999/33] | French: | UTILISATION COMME AGENTS PROTECTEURS DE COMPOSES LIBERANT DE L'OXYDE NITRIQUE POUR LA FABRICATION D'UN MEDICAMENT DESTINE A TRAITER DES LESIONS CONSECUTIVES A DES PERFUSIONS REPETEES EN CAS D'ISCHEMIE | [1999/33] |
Former [1996/34] | VERWENDUNG VON STICKSTOFFOXID FREISETZENDEN VERBINDUNGEN ALS SCHUTZMITTEL GEGEN DIE ISCHÄMISCHEN REPERFUSIONSSCHÄDEN | ||
Former [1996/34] | USE OF NITRIC OXIDE RELEASING COMPOUNDS AS PROTECTIVE AGENTS IN ISCHEMIA REPERFUSION INJURY | ||
Former [1996/34] | UTILISATION COMME AGENTS PROTECTEURS DE COMPOSES LIBERANT DE L'OXYDE NITRIQUE POUR TRAITER DES LESIONS CONSECUTIVES A DES PERFUSIONS REPETEES EN CAS D'ISCHEMIE | Entry into regional phase | 22.05.1996 | National basic fee paid | 22.05.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.05.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.05.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 22.05.1996 | Examination requested [1996/34] | 18.02.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.07.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.07.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.11.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.02.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 10.02.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.02.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X] - "Antishock and endothelial protective actions of a NO donor in mesenteric ischemia and reperfusion", CIRC.SHOCK, (1992), vol. 38, pages 209 - 16 [X] 1-17 * the whole document * | [X] - "Cardioprotection and attenuation of endothelial dysfunction by organic nitric oxide donors in myocardial ischemia reperfusion", J.PHARMACOL.EXP.THER., (1992), vol. 260, no. 2, pages 668 - 75 [X] 1-17 * the whole document * | [X] - "Effect of nitric oxide generators on ischemia reperfusion injury and histamine release in isolated perfused guinea pig heart", INT.ARCH.ALLERG.APPL.IMMUNOL., (1991), vol. 94, pages 257 - 8 [X] 1-17 * page 257, column L, line 11 - line 25 * | [X] - "The effect of nitric oxide generators on ischemia reperfusion injury and histamine release in isolated guinea pig hearts", BIOL.NITRIC OXIDE, PROC.INT.MEET., 2ND EDITOR:MONCADA, SALVADOR (ED), 1992, VOL.1, P.190-2, pages 190 - 2 [X] 1-17 * page 192, line 14 - line 23 * | [X] - "Ischemia and reperfusion injury and histamine release in isolated perfused guinea pig heart: effects of nitric oxide generators", PHARMACOL.RES., (1992), vol. 25, no. SP.1, pages 11 - 12 [X] 1-17 * page 11, line 22 - page 12, line 4 * | [X] - J.CARDIOVASC.PHARMACOL.(PROCEEDINGS OF A SYMPOSIUM HELD ON 15.11.1992 IN NEW ORLEANS, LOUISIANA) VOL.22, SUPPL.7, 1993, S27-S33 [X] 1-17 * the whole document * | [XP] - "Antineutrophil and myocardial protecting actions of a novel nitric oxide donor after acute myocardial ischemia and reperfusion in dogs", CIRCULATION, (199311), vol. 88, no. 5(1), pages 2337 - 50 [XP] 1-17 * page 2337 - page 2338 * * page 2346 - page 2347 * | Examination | US3153094 | - INORG.CHEM. 2 1963,85-88 |