EP0731938 - CIRCUITRY FOR EVALUATING THE SIGNALS OF A YAW RATE SENSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.06.1999 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.06.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.08.1999 [1999/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/38] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ULM, Michael Dahlienweg 24 D-93087 Alteglofsheim / DE | [1996/38] | Application number, filing date | 95900624.8 | 14.11.1994 | [1996/38] | WO1994DE01341 | Priority number, date | DE19934340719 | 30.11.1993 Original published format: DE 4340719 | [1996/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9515519 | Date: | 08.06.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0731938 | Date: | 18.09.1996 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.06.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0731938 | Date: | 12.08.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.06.1995 | Classification | IPC: | G05D1/02, G01C25/00, G01C22/02 | [1996/38] | CPC: |
G01C25/00 (EP);
G05D1/02 (KR);
G01C22/025 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1996/38] | Title | German: | SCHALTUNGSANORDNUNG ZUM AUSWERTEN DER SIGNALE EINES GIERGESCHWINDIGKEITSSENSORS | [1996/38] | English: | CIRCUITRY FOR EVALUATING THE SIGNALS OF A YAW RATE SENSOR | [1996/38] | French: | CIRCUIT D'EVALUATION DES SIGNAUX EMIS PAR UN CAPTEUR DE VITESSE D'EMBARDEE | [1996/38] | Entry into regional phase | 06.05.1996 | National basic fee paid | 06.05.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.05.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.05.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 06.05.1996 | Examination requested [1996/38] | 20.01.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.02.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.05.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 05.05.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.05.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]DE3346434 (TELDIX GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-3 * claim . * * page 3, line 13 - line 31 * * page 5, line 12 - line 21 * [Y] 6; | [YD]DE3919347 (AISIN SEIKI [JP]) [YD] 6 * figure 1; claim A *; | [A]WO9012698 (LOTUS GROUP PLC [GB]) [A] 1 * page 2, line 17 - page 3, line 11 * * page 4, line 25 - page 5, line 9; figure 1 *; | [A]US3882731 (KONING MENNO G) [A] 1 * column 4, line 43 - column 6, line 47; figures 1-4 * |