EP0804117 - A DEVICE WHICH HOLDS AT LEAST ONE BOTTLE AND/OR CONTAINER UPRIGHT OR INVERTED [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.10.1998 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.10.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.11.1998 [1998/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MANDERS, Paulus Maria 632 Barbadoes Street Christchurch 8001 / NZ | [1997/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
POOLE, Richard Flat 1 199 Cranford Street Christchurch / NZ | [1997/45] | Representative(s) | Perkins, Sarah Stevens Hewlett & Perkins 1 St Augustine's Place Bristol BS1 4UD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/45] | Perkins, Sarah Stevens, Hewlett & Perkins 1 Serjeants' Inn Fleet Street London EC4Y 1LL / GB | Application number, filing date | 95900943.2 | 18.11.1994 | [1997/45] | WO1994NZ00133 | Priority number, date | NZ19930248984 | 18.11.1993 Original published format: NZ 24898493 | [1997/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9513735 | Date: | 26.05.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0804117 | Date: | 05.11.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.05.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 26.05.1995 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.02.1998 | Classification | IPC: | A47K5/13, A47G23/02 | [1997/45] | CPC: |
A47G23/0225 (EP);
A47K5/13 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1997/45] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM AUFRECHTEN ODER UMGEKEHRTEN HALTEN ZUMINDEST EINER FLASCHE/EINES BEHÄLTERS | [1997/45] | English: | A DEVICE WHICH HOLDS AT LEAST ONE BOTTLE AND/OR CONTAINER UPRIGHT OR INVERTED | [1997/45] | French: | DISPOSITIF MAINTENANT AU MOINS UNE BOUTEILLE ET/OU UN RECIPIENT EN POSITION DEBOUT OU RENVERSEE | [1997/45] | Entry into regional phase | 09.09.1996 | National basic fee paid | 09.09.1996 | Search fee paid | 09.09.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.09.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.06.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU | 09.09.1996 | Examination requested [1997/45] | 19.05.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1998/47] | 23.06.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1998/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 07.08.1996 | AT   M01   Fee paid on   09.09.1996 | 07.08.1996 | BE   M01   Fee paid on   09.09.1996 | 07.08.1996 | CH   M01   Fee paid on   09.09.1996 | 07.08.1996 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   09.09.1996 | 07.08.1996 | DK   M01   Fee paid on   09.09.1996 | 07.08.1996 | ES   M01   Fee paid on   09.09.1996 | 07.08.1996 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   09.09.1996 | 07.08.1996 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   09.09.1996 | 07.08.1996 | GR   M01   Fee paid on   09.09.1996 | 07.08.1996 | IE   M01   Fee paid on   09.09.1996 | 07.08.1996 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   09.09.1996 | 07.08.1996 | LI   M01   Fee paid on   09.09.1996 | 07.08.1996 | LU   M01   Fee paid on   09.09.1996 | 07.08.1996 | MC   M01   Fee paid on   09.09.1996 | 07.08.1996 | NL   M01   Fee paid on   09.09.1996 | 07.08.1996 | PT   M01   Fee paid on   09.09.1996 | 07.08.1996 | SE   M01   Fee paid on   09.09.1996 | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 07.08.1996 | M01   Fee paid on   09.09.1996 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.1997 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE3641411 (M. LANG) [X] 8,10 * column 3, line 13 - column 4, line 5; figure 1 * | International search | [X]GB224653 ; | [X]DE2211291 ; | [Y]US2463651 ; | [Y]FR592143 ; | [Y]WO9005473 ; | [X]GB282436 ; | [X]GB654113 ; | [X]US1648811 |