EP0788722 - APPARATUS AND METHOD OF ENHANCING AUDIO SIGNALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.03.2000 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.03.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.05.2000 [2000/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states True Dimensional Sound, Inc. 1450 Madruga Avenue, Suite 404 Coral Gables Florida 33146 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1999/21] | For all designated states True Dimensional Sound, Inc. 1450 Madruga Avenue, Suite 404 Coral Gables, Florida 33146 / US | ||
Former [1997/33] | For all designated states True Dimension Sound, Inc. 1450 Madruga Avenue, Suite 404 Coral Gables, Florida 33146 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GARCIA, Arturo, J. 25323 S.W. 127 Place Miami, FL 33032 / US | [1997/33] | Representative(s) | Cummings, Sean Patrick, et al Keltie LLP No.1 London Bridge London SE1 9BA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/33] | Cummings, Sean Patrick, et al David Keltie Associates, 12 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1AP / GB | Application number, filing date | 95901061.2 | 27.10.1994 | [1997/33] | WO1994US12328 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9613959 | Date: | 09.05.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0788722 | Date: | 13.08.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.05.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0788722 | Date: | 26.05.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.05.1996 | Classification | IPC: | H03G5/04, H04R9/02 | [1999/21] | CPC: |
H03G5/18 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1997/33] | H04R9/02 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1997/33] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR VERBESSERUNG VON TONSIGNALEN | [1997/33] | English: | APPARATUS AND METHOD OF ENHANCING AUDIO SIGNALS | [1997/33] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF D'AMELIORATION DE SIGNAUX AUDIO | [1997/33] | Entry into regional phase | 23.05.1997 | National basic fee paid | 23.05.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.05.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.05.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 23.05.1997 | Examination requested [1997/33] | 09.06.1997 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.02.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.05.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.07.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.12.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.03.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 03.03.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.02.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH01186008 ; | [A]JPH02311006 ; | [A]GB2137427 (MCCULLOCH CORP) [A] 1-7 * page 1, lines 5-6 * * page 2, lines 52-73 * * page 3, lines 59-88 * * page 4, lines 33-72 *; | [A]US4692852 (HOOVER ALAN A [US]) [A] 1-3,10-14 * column 1, lines 5-7 * * column 1, lines 38-54 * * column 2, line 1 - column 3, line 17 ** column 4, line 60 - column 7, line 37 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19891026), vol. 13, no. 474, Database accession no. (E - 836), & JP01186008 A 19890725 (MATSUSHITA) [A] 1,8-11 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19910313), vol. 15, no. 106, Database accession no. (E - 1044), & JP02311006 A 19901229 (PIONEER) [A] 1,10 * abstract * |