EP0728037 - METHOD OF FORMING PARTICLES USING A SUPERCRITICAL FLUID, AEROGEL PARTICLES FORMED THEREBY, AND ANTIPERSPIRANTS CONTAINING AEROGEL PARTICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.11.1999 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): DK | published on 05.11.2003 [2003/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Gillette Company Prudential Tower Building Boston, MA 02199 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1998/28] | For all designated states THE GILLETTE COMPANY Prudential Tower Building Boston, Massachusetts 02199 / US | ||
Former [1996/35] | For all designated states The Gillette Company Prudential Tower Building Boston, Massachusetts 02190 / US | ||
For all designated states CF TECHNOLOGIES, INC. Suite 200, One Westinghouse Plaza Hyde Park, MA 02136 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROUANET, Stephane, Fabrice 1608 River Street, No. 202 Hyde Park, MA 02136 / US | 02 /
MCGOVERN, William, Edward 47 Mullins Avenue Duxbury, MA 02332 / US | 03 /
CAO, Wanqing 324 Kitty Hawk Road, No. 307 Alameda, CA 94501 / US | 04 /
KLOTZ, Irving, M. 2515 Pioneer Road Evanston, IL 60201-2203 / US | 05 /
CARRILLO, Angel, L. 11 Vane Street Wellesley, MA 02181 / US | 06 /
MOSES, John, M. 105 Vincent Road Dedham, MA 02026 / US | [1996/35] | Representative(s) | Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al Ladas & Parry, Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/28] | Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al Ladas & Parry, Altheimer Eck 2 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [1996/35] | Madgwick, Paul Roland Ladas & Parry Altheimer Eck 2 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95901125.5 | 07.11.1994 | [1996/35] | WO1994US12669 | Priority number, date | US19930149190 | 08.11.1993 Original published format: US 149190 | US19940333289 | 02.11.1994 Original published format: US 333289 | [1996/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9513132 | Date: | 18.05.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0728037 | Date: | 28.08.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.05.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0728037 | Date: | 13.01.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.05.1995 | Classification | IPC: | B01J13/00, A61K7/32 | [1996/35] | CPC: |
A61Q15/00 (EP,US);
A61K8/042 (EP,US);
A61K8/26 (EP,US);
B01J13/0091 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1996/35] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR FORMUNG VON PARTIKELN UNTER VERWENDUNG EINER ÜBERKRITISCHEN FLÜSSIGKEIT SO HERGESTELLTE AEROGELPARTIKEL UND AEROGELPARTIKEL ENTHALTENDEN ANTIPERSPIRANTIEN | [1996/35] | English: | METHOD OF FORMING PARTICLES USING A SUPERCRITICAL FLUID, AEROGEL PARTICLES FORMED THEREBY, AND ANTIPERSPIRANTS CONTAINING AEROGEL PARTICLES | [1996/35] | French: | PROCEDE DE FORMATION DE PARTICULES A L'AIDE D'UN FLUIDE SUPERCRITIQUE, PARTICULES D'AEROGEL AINSI FORMEES, ET ANTISUDORIFIQUES CONTENANT DES PARTICULES D'AEROGEL | [1996/35] | Entry into regional phase | 03.06.1996 | National basic fee paid | 03.06.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.06.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.05.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 03.06.1996 | Examination requested [1996/35] | 21.10.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.12.1996 | Observations by third parties | 03.06.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 12.08.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.10.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.04.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.07.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 07.07.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP03008149.1 Application deemed to be withdrawn : 09.05.2003 | EP98103361.6 / EP0868942 | Opposition(s) | 14.10.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/01] | Request for further processing for: | 12.08.1997 | Request for further processing filed | 12.08.1997 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 26.08.1997 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 13.01.1999 | BE | 13.01.1999 | CH | 13.01.1999 | GR | 13.01.1999 | LI | 13.01.1999 | NL | 13.01.1999 | SE | 13.01.1999 | DK | 13.04.1999 | PT | 13.04.1999 | [2003/45] |
Former [2003/08] | AT | 13.01.1999 | |
BE | 13.01.1999 | ||
CH | 13.01.1999 | ||
GR | 13.01.1999 | ||
LI | 13.01.1999 | ||
NL | 13.01.1999 | ||
SE | 13.01.1999 | ||
PT | 13.04.1999 | ||
Former [2002/23] | AT | 13.01.1999 | |
BE | 13.01.1999 | ||
CH | 13.01.1999 | ||
GR | 13.01.1999 | ||
LI | 13.01.1999 | ||
SE | 13.01.1999 | ||
PT | 13.04.1999 | ||
Former [2001/23] | AT | 13.01.1999 | |
BE | 13.01.1999 | ||
CH | 13.01.1999 | ||
GR | 13.01.1999 | ||
LI | 13.01.1999 | ||
PT | 13.04.1999 | ||
Former [2000/52] | AT | 13.01.1999 | |
BE | 13.01.1999 | ||
CH | 13.01.1999 | ||
LI | 13.01.1999 | ||
PT | 13.04.1999 | ||
Former [2000/50] | AT | 13.01.1999 | |
BE | 13.01.1999 | ||
PT | 13.04.1999 | ||
CH | 19.04.1999 | ||
LI | 19.04.1999 | ||
Former [2000/23] | AT | 13.01.1999 | |
BE | 13.01.1999 | ||
PT | 13.04.1999 | ||
Former [2000/21] | AT | 13.01.1999 | Cited in | International search | [A]GB880261 (ALBRIGHT & WILSON MFG LTD); | [A]EP0149816 (STAUFFER CHEMICAL CO [US]) [A] 1-63; | [A]EP0171722 (BASF AG [DE]) [A] 1-63 * claim - *; | [A]EP0186149 (STAUFFER CHEMICAL CO [US]) [A] 1-63; | [A]US4610863 (TEWARI PARAM H [US], et al); | [A]US5232689 (KATSOULIS DIMITRIS E [US], et al) | other | EP0322687 | WO9003782 | WO9501221 |