EP0728374 - CONNECTOR ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.01.2004 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.01.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.03.2004 [2004/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BERG ELECTRONICS MANUFACTURING B.V. Helftheuvelweg 11 5222 AV s'-Hertogenbosch / NL | [1998/33] |
Former [1996/35] | For:DE
FR
BERG ELECTRONICS MANUFACTURING B.V. Helftheuvelweg 11 5222 AV s'-Hertogenbosch / NL | ||
For:GB
CONNECTOR SYSTEMS TECHNOLOGY N.V. Julianaplein 22 Willemstad Curaçao / AN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NORTHEY, William, Arthur 95 Village Road Etters, PA 17319 / US | 02 /
KOSER, James, R. 330 College Avenue Elizabeth, PA 17022 / US | [1996/35] | Representative(s) | Brookes IP Windsor House 6-10 Mount Ephraim Road Tunbridge Wells, Kent TN1 1EE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/35] | BROOKES & MARTIN High Holborn House 52/54 High Holborn London, WC1V 6SE / GB | Application number, filing date | 95901164.4 | 07.11.1994 | [1996/35] | WO1994US12792 | Priority number, date | US19930149475 | 09.11.1993 Original published format: US 149475 | [1996/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9513634 | Date: | 18.05.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0728374 | Date: | 28.08.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.05.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 18.05.1995 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.11.1996 | Classification | IPC: | H01R13/648, H01R23/68, H01R23/70, H01R23/00 | [1996/52] | CPC: |
H01R13/035 (EP,US);
H01R13/648 (KR);
H01R12/716 (EP,US);
H01R12/737 (EP,US);
H01R13/6471 (EP,US);
H01R13/6474 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1996/35] | H01R13/648 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1996/35] | Title | German: | STECKVERBINDERZUSAMMENBAU | [1996/35] | English: | CONNECTOR ASSEMBLY | [1996/35] | French: | ENSEMBLE CONNECTEUR | [1996/35] | Entry into regional phase | 03.06.1996 | National basic fee paid | 03.06.1996 | Search fee paid | 03.06.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.06.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.06.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 05.06.1996 | Examination requested [1996/35] | 28.04.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.09.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/11] | 13.10.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2004/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2003 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2001484 (TELEPHONIE IND COMMERCIALE) [A] 1,9 * page 1, line 79 - line 92; figure . *; | [A]JPS60236183 ; | [A]JPS59207476 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19860418), vol. 010, no. 102, Database accession no. (P - 448), & JP60236183 A 19851122 (MATSUSHITA DENKI SANGYO KK) [A] 1,9 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19850405), vol. 009, no. 076, Database accession no. (P - 346), & JP59207476 A 19841124 (MATSUSHITA DENKI SANGYO KK) [A] 1,9 * abstract * | International search | [A]US4245876 (RITCHIE LEON T, et al); | [A]US4391482 (CZESCHKA FRANZ [DE]); | [A]US4655518 (JOHNSON LENNART B [US], et al); | [A]US4686607 (JOHNSON LENNART B [US]); | [A]US4775333 (GRIDER DUANE M [US], et al); | [A]US4869677 (JOHNSON LENNART B [US], et al); | [A]US5104329 (BROWN JEFFREY J [US], et al); | [A]US5176526 (HILLBISH WARREN C [US], et al); | [A]US5228864 (FUSSELMAN DAVID F [US], et al) |