EP0779860 - DAMPENING SYSTEMS FOR LITHOGRAPHIC PRINTING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.03.1998 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.03.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.05.1998 [1998/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FADNER, Thomas A. 1498 Highway 41 South Oshkosh, WI 54903-3012 / US | [1997/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1997/26] | Representative(s) | Woodward, John Calvin, et al Venner Shipley LLP 20 Little Britain London EC1A 7DH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/26] | Woodward, John Calvin, et al Venner Shipley & Co. 20 Little Britain London EC1A 7DH / GB | Application number, filing date | 95901256.8 | 15.11.1994 | [1997/26] | WO1994US13183 | Priority number, date | US19940302519 | 08.09.1994 Original published format: US 302519 | [1997/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9607542 | Date: | 14.03.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0779860 | Date: | 25.06.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.03.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 14.03.1996 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.09.1997 | Classification | IPC: | B41F1/40, B41F31/00, B41L23/00, B41L25/00, B41F7/36 | [1997/42] | CPC: |
B41F7/26 (EP,US);
B41F7/36 (EP,US);
B41P2231/21 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1997/26] | B41F1/40, B41F31/00, B41L23/00, B41L25/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1997/26] | Title | German: | BEFEUCHTUNGSSYSTEME FÜR DAS LITHOGRAPHISCHE DRUCKEN | [1997/26] | English: | DAMPENING SYSTEMS FOR LITHOGRAPHIC PRINTING | [1997/26] | French: | SYSTEMES DE MOUILLAGE POUR IMPRESSION LITHOGRAPHIQUE | [1997/26] | Entry into regional phase | 27.02.1997 | National basic fee paid | 27.02.1997 | Search fee paid | 27.02.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.02.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.04.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 27.02.1997 | Examination requested [1997/26] | 09.10.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1998/19] | 06.11.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1998/19] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 08.04.1997 | 03   M06   Not yet paid | 30.11.1997 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [Y]US4461208 ; | [Y]US5107762 ; | [A]US4944223 |