EP0730592 - DERIVATIVES OF 2,3,5,6-TETRAFLUOROBENZOIC ACID AND THEIR USE IN COMBATING PESTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.10.2000 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.10.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.12.2000 [2000/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAYER AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [1996/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KRAATZ, Udo Andreasstrasse 22a D-51375 Leverkusen / DE | 02 /
HÄNSSLER, Gerd Am Arenzberg 58a D-51381 Leverkusen / DE | [1996/37] | Application number, filing date | 95901380.6 | 14.11.1994 | [1996/37] | WO1994EP03775 | Priority number, date | DE19934340180 | 25.11.1993 Original published format: DE 4340180 | [1996/37] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9514688 | Date: | 01.06.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0730592 | Date: | 11.09.1996 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.06.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.06.1995 | Classification | IPC: | C07D295/185, C07C233/87, C07C235/06, C07C233/65, C07C233/66, C07C233/75, C07C233/83, C07C219/14, C07C233/78, C07D295/192, C07D521/00 | [1996/37] | CPC: |
C07D295/185 (EP);
A01N37/10 (EP);
A01N37/12 (EP);
A01N37/18 (EP);
A01N37/20 (EP);
A01N37/22 (EP);
A01N37/24 (EP);
A01N37/36 (EP);
A01N37/46 (EP);
A01N43/36 (EP);
A01N43/653 (EP);
C07C233/65 (EP);
C07C233/66 (EP);
C07C233/78 (EP);
C07C233/83 (EP);
C07C233/87 (EP);
C07C235/00 (EP);
C07C69/76 (EP);
C07D207/16 (EP);
C07D231/12 (EP);
C07D233/56 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, NL, PT [1996/37] | Title | German: | DERIVATE DER 2,3,5,6-TETRAFLUOROBENZOESÄURE UND IHRE VERWENDUNG ZUR BEKÄMPFUNG VON SCHÄDLINGEN | [1996/37] | English: | DERIVATIVES OF 2,3,5,6-TETRAFLUOROBENZOIC ACID AND THEIR USE IN COMBATING PESTS | [1996/37] | French: | DERIVES D'ACIDE 2,3,5,6-TETRAFLUOROBENZOIQUE ET LEUR UTILISATION POUR LUTTER CONTRE LES PARASITES | [1996/37] | Entry into regional phase | 13.05.1996 | National basic fee paid | 13.05.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.05.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.03.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 13.05.1996 | Examination requested [1996/37] | 08.02.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.06.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2000/49] | 13.07.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2000/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0028346 (BAYER AG) [A] 1,4-6,8,9 * page 16, line 1 - line 13; claims 1,5-8 *; | [A]US4055663 (S. J. BARER ET AL) [A] 1,5,6,8,9 * column 1, line 5 - line 8; claim 1 * * column 1, line 45 - column 2, line 26 *; | [A]DE1642232 (BASF) [A] 1,5,6,8,9 * example 3; claim . * |