EP0729434 - FLUID DISPENSING SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.07.1999 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 06.02.2008 [2008/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Reunion Cellar Equipment Limited 31 Dunstall Lane, St Mary's Bay Dymchurch, Kent TN29 1QW / GB | [1999/09] |
Former [1996/36] | For all designated states REUNION MANAGEMENT LIMITED Cromwell Tower, The Barbican London, EC2V 8DD / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COLEMAN, Geoffrey John, 44 Cam Street Dursley Gloucestershire GL11 5HN / GB | 02 /
COLEMAN, Guy Timothy, The Passage Inn Arlingham Gloucestershire GL2 7JR / GB | [1996/36] | Representative(s) | Higgins, Michael Roger, et al A.R. Davies & Co. 27, Imperial Square Cheltenham Glos. GL50 1RQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/09] | Higgins, Michael Roger, et al A.R. Davies & Co. 27, Imperial Square Cheltenham Glos. GL50 1RQ / GB | ||
Former [1996/36] | Harding, Richard Patrick, et al A. R. Davies & Co. 27 Imperial Square Cheltenham GL50 1RQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 95901518.1 | 21.11.1994 | [1996/36] | WO1994GB02553 | Priority number, date | GB19930024379 | 26.11.1993 Original published format: GB 9324379 | [1996/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9514633 | Date: | 01.06.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0729434 | Date: | 04.09.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.06.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0729434 | Date: | 02.09.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.06.1995 | Classification | IPC: | B67D1/04, B67D5/06 | [1996/36] | CPC: |
B67D7/062 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [1996/36] | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUM AUSSCHENKEN VON FLÜSSIGKEITEN | [1996/36] | English: | FLUID DISPENSING SYSTEMS | [1996/36] | French: | SYSTEME DE DIFFUSION POUR FLUIDE | [1996/36] | Entry into regional phase | 24.05.1996 | National basic fee paid | 24.05.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.05.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.06.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 24.05.1996 | Examination requested [1996/36] | 19.11.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.03.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.10.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.02.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.05.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 22.05.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.06.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.1997 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   26.03.1998 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 02.09.1998 | CH | 02.09.1998 | GR | 02.09.1998 | IT | 02.09.1998 | LI | 02.09.1998 | IE | 21.11.1998 | ES | 22.11.1998 | BE | 30.11.1998 | DK | 02.12.1998 | GB | 02.12.1998 | SE | 02.12.1998 | DE | 03.12.1998 | PT | 09.12.1998 | [2008/06] |
Former [2004/28] | AT | 02.09.1998 | |
CH | 02.09.1998 | ||
GR | 02.09.1998 | ||
LI | 02.09.1998 | ||
IE | 21.11.1998 | ||
ES | 22.11.1998 | ||
BE | 30.11.1998 | ||
DK | 02.12.1998 | ||
GB | 02.12.1998 | ||
SE | 02.12.1998 | ||
DE | 03.12.1998 | ||
PT | 09.12.1998 | ||
Former [2003/45] | AT | 02.09.1998 | |
CH | 02.09.1998 | ||
GR | 02.09.1998 | ||
LI | 02.09.1998 | ||
IE | 21.11.1998 | ||
BE | 30.11.1998 | ||
DK | 02.12.1998 | ||
GB | 02.12.1998 | ||
SE | 02.12.1998 | ||
DE | 03.12.1998 | ||
PT | 09.12.1998 | ||
Former [2001/23] | AT | 02.09.1998 | |
CH | 02.09.1998 | ||
GR | 02.09.1998 | ||
LI | 02.09.1998 | ||
IE | 21.11.1998 | ||
BE | 30.11.1998 | ||
GB | 02.12.1998 | ||
SE | 02.12.1998 | ||
DE | 03.12.1998 | ||
PT | 09.12.1998 | ||
Former [2000/52] | AT | 02.09.1998 | |
CH | 02.09.1998 | ||
LI | 02.09.1998 | ||
IE | 21.11.1998 | ||
BE | 30.11.1998 | ||
GB | 02.12.1998 | ||
SE | 02.12.1998 | ||
DE | 03.12.1998 | ||
PT | 09.12.1998 | ||
Former [2000/50] | AT | 02.09.1998 | |
IE | 21.11.1998 | ||
BE | 30.11.1998 | ||
GB | 02.12.1998 | ||
SE | 02.12.1998 | ||
DE | 03.12.1998 | ||
CH | 08.12.1998 | ||
LI | 08.12.1998 | ||
PT | 09.12.1998 | ||
Former [2000/27] | AT | 02.09.1998 | |
IE | 21.11.1998 | ||
BE | 30.11.1998 | ||
GB | 02.12.1998 | ||
SE | 02.12.1998 | ||
DE | 03.12.1998 | ||
PT | 09.12.1998 | ||
Former [2000/23] | AT | 02.09.1998 | |
BE | 30.11.1998 | ||
GB | 02.12.1998 | ||
SE | 02.12.1998 | ||
DE | 03.12.1998 | ||
PT | 09.12.1998 | ||
Former [2000/03] | AT | 02.09.1998 | |
GB | 02.12.1998 | ||
SE | 02.12.1998 | ||
DE | 03.12.1998 | ||
PT | 09.12.1998 | ||
Former [1999/34] | AT | 02.09.1998 | |
SE | 02.12.1998 | ||
DE | 03.12.1998 | ||
PT | 09.12.1998 | ||
Former [1999/32] | SE | 02.12.1998 | |
DE | 03.12.1998 | ||
PT | 09.12.1998 | ||
Former [1999/30] | DE | 03.12.1998 | |
PT | 09.12.1998 | ||
Former [1999/29] | PT | 09.12.1998 | Cited in | International search | [X]GB161308 (FRANK PULLEN CANDY) [X] 1,2,5,10 * the whole document *; | [XA]GB962404 (MEGATOR PUMPS COMPRESSOR) [X] 1,2,10 * the whole document * [A] 3,4; | [XA]US3172581 (MARTIN NANNI) [X] 1,10 * the whole document *[A] 7-9; | [X]GB1207900 (COTTO SCUNTHORPE LTD) [X] 1,2,10 * the whole document *; | [X]DE2401775 (MULLER JACQUES) [X] 1,2,5,10 * page 3, line 11 - page 4, line 3 * * page 4, line 21 - page 6, line 5 * * figures 1,4 *; | [XA]BE1000346 (VANDER ELST JACQUES) [X] 1,6,10 * the whole document * [A] 9 |