EP0729569 - APPARATUS FOR DETERMINING THE ERYTHROCYTE SEDIMENTATION RATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 18.06.1999 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.06.1999 | Withdrawal of application | published on 04.08.1999 [1999/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Swelab Instrument AB P.O. Box 42056 126 13 Stockholm / SE | [1996/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JACOBSON, Bertil Västra Myrskären 41 S-746 91 Balsta / SE | 02 /
ZHAO, Tian-xian, Dept. of Med. Physics and Clin. Engineering, Royal Hallamshire Hosp. Glossop Road, Sheffield S10 27F / GB | [1996/36] | Representative(s) | Nyberg, Bengt CARMINGER, UUSITALO & NYBERG Patentbyra AB P.O. Box 7274 103 89 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/36] | Nyberg, Bengt CARMINGER, UUSITALO & NYBERG Patentbyra AB P.O. Box 7274 103 89 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 95901660.1 | 15.11.1994 | [1996/36] | WO1994SE01075 | Priority number, date | SE19930003751 | 15.11.1993 Original published format: SE 9303751 | SE19940001646 | 11.05.1994 Original published format: SE 9401646 | [1996/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9514224 | Date: | 26.05.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0729569 | Date: | 04.09.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.05.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 26.05.1995 | Classification | IPC: | G01N15/05, G01N27/02, G01N33/48, G01N33/49 | [1996/36] | CPC: |
G01N15/05 (EP);
G01N33/491 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1996/36] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR BESTIMMUNG DER ERYTHROZYTENSEDIMENTATIONSRATE | [1996/36] | English: | APPARATUS FOR DETERMINING THE ERYTHROCYTE SEDIMENTATION RATE | [1996/36] | French: | APPAREIL POUR DETERMINER LA VITESSE DE SEDIMENTATION DES ERYHTROCYTES | [1996/36] | Entry into regional phase | 31.05.1996 | National basic fee paid | 31.05.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.05.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.06.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 31.05.1996 | Examination requested [1996/36] | 04.06.1999 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1999/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9318395 ; | [A]US3254527 ; | [A]WO9109295 ; | [A]FR2201762 | [XP] - DIALOG INFORMATION SERVICE, File 155, Medline, Dialog Accession No. 08785229, ZHAO TX et al.: "Electrial Impedance and Erythrocyte Sedimentation Rate (ESR), of Blood"; & BIOCHIM. BIOPHYS. ACTA, (Netherlands), 12 Dec. 1993, 1153 (2), p. 243-8. |