EP0734418 - IMPACT-MODIFIED POLYMER BLENDS CONTAINING A LIQUID CRYSTALLINE POLYMER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 03.03.2000 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 06.02.2008 [2008/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EASTMAN CHEMICAL COMPANY 100 North Eastman Road Kingsport TN 37660 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1996/40] | For all designated states EASTMAN CHEMICAL COMPANY 100 North Eastman Road Kingsport, TN 37660 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STACK, Gary, Michael P.O. Box 6446 Kingsport, TN 37663 / US | 02 /
STEWART, Mark, Edward 1104 Dover Drive Kingsport, TN 37664-5188 / US | 03 /
SEYMOUR, Robert, William 1341 Belmeade Drive Kinsport, TN 37664 / US | [1996/40] | Representative(s) | Wibbelmann, Jobst, et al Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/40] | Wibbelmann, Jobst, Dr., Dipl.-Chem., et al Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95901904.3 | 14.11.1994 | [1996/40] | WO1994US13126 | Priority number, date | US19930160006 | 30.11.1993 Original published format: US 160006 | [1996/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9515360 | Date: | 08.06.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0734418 | Date: | 02.10.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.06.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0734418 | Date: | 29.07.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.06.1995 | Classification | IPC: | C08L67/02, C08L101/06 | [1996/40] | CPC: |
C08L23/08 (EP);
C08L67/02 (KR);
C08L101/06 (EP,KR);
C08L63/00 (EP);
C08L2205/12 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C08L101/06, C08L2666/18 (EP);
C08L23/08, C08L2666/18 (EP);
C08L63/00, C08L2666/18 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1996/40] | Title | German: | SCHLAGFESTE FLÜSSIGKRISTALLINE POLYMER ENTHALTENDE POLYMERMISCHUNGEN | [1996/40] | English: | IMPACT-MODIFIED POLYMER BLENDS CONTAINING A LIQUID CRYSTALLINE POLYMER | [1996/40] | French: | MELANGES DE POLYMERES DONT LA RESISTANCE AUX CHOCS EST MODIFIEE CONTENANT UN POLYMERE CRISTALLIN LIQUIDE | [1996/40] | Entry into regional phase | 23.05.1996 | National basic fee paid | 23.05.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.05.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.05.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 23.05.1996 | Examination requested [1996/40] | 17.10.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.02.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.12.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.02.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.04.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 20.04.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
26.04.1999
ADMISSIBLE E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY 1007 Market Street Wilmington DE 19898 / US Opponent's representative James, Anthony Christopher W.P. Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/24] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
26.04.1999
ADMISSIBLE E.I. Du Pont de Nemours and Company 1007 Market Street Wilmington, Del. 19898 / US Opponent's representative James, Anthony Christopher W.P. Carpmaels & Ransford 43 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | 09.07.1999 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 22.11.1999 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 02.12.1999 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2000/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 29.07.1998 | BE | 29.07.1998 | CH | 29.07.1998 | IT | 29.07.1998 | LI | 29.07.1998 | NL | 29.07.1998 | DK | 29.10.1998 | PT | 29.10.1998 | SE | 29.10.1998 | ES | 30.10.1998 | GR | 30.10.1998 | IE | 14.11.1998 | LU | 14.11.1998 | [2008/06] |
Former [2004/51] | AT | 29.07.1998 | |
BE | 29.07.1998 | ||
CH | 29.07.1998 | ||
LI | 29.07.1998 | ||
NL | 29.07.1998 | ||
DK | 29.10.1998 | ||
PT | 29.10.1998 | ||
SE | 29.10.1998 | ||
ES | 30.10.1998 | ||
GR | 30.10.1998 | ||
IE | 14.11.1998 | ||
LU | 14.11.1998 | ||
Former [2004/39] | AT | 29.07.1998 | |
BE | 29.07.1998 | ||
CH | 29.07.1998 | ||
LI | 29.07.1998 | ||
NL | 29.07.1998 | ||
DK | 29.10.1998 | ||
PT | 29.10.1998 | ||
SE | 29.10.1998 | ||
ES | 30.10.1998 | ||
IE | 14.11.1998 | ||
LU | 14.11.1998 | ||
Former [2004/38] | AT | 29.07.1998 | |
BE | 29.07.1998 | ||
CH | 29.07.1998 | ||
LI | 29.07.1998 | ||
NL | 29.07.1998 | ||
DK | 29.10.1998 | ||
PT | 29.10.1998 | ||
SE | 29.10.1998 | ||
ES | 30.10.1998 | ||
IE | 14.11.1998 | ||
LU | 30.11.1998 | ||
Former [2003/45] | AT | 29.07.1998 | |
BE | 29.07.1998 | ||
CH | 29.07.1998 | ||
LI | 29.07.1998 | ||
NL | 29.07.1998 | ||
DK | 29.10.1998 | ||
PT | 29.10.1998 | ||
SE | 29.10.1998 | ||
IE | 14.11.1998 | ||
LU | 30.11.1998 | ||
Former [2003/08] | AT | 29.07.1998 | |
BE | 29.07.1998 | ||
CH | 29.07.1998 | ||
LI | 29.07.1998 | ||
NL | 29.07.1998 | ||
PT | 29.10.1998 | ||
SE | 29.10.1998 | ||
IE | 14.11.1998 | ||
LU | 30.11.1998 | ||
Former [2000/52] | AT | 29.07.1998 | |
BE | 29.07.1998 | ||
CH | 29.07.1998 | ||
LI | 29.07.1998 | ||
PT | 29.10.1998 | ||
SE | 29.10.1998 | ||
IE | 14.11.1998 | ||
LU | 30.11.1998 | ||
Former [2000/50] | AT | 29.07.1998 | |
BE | 29.07.1998 | ||
PT | 29.10.1998 | ||
SE | 29.10.1998 | ||
CH | 03.11.1998 | ||
LI | 03.11.1998 | ||
IE | 14.11.1998 | ||
LU | 30.11.1998 | ||
Former [2000/27] | AT | 29.07.1998 | |
BE | 29.07.1998 | ||
PT | 29.10.1998 | ||
SE | 29.10.1998 | ||
IE | 14.11.1998 | ||
LU | 30.11.1998 | ||
Former [2000/07] | AT | 29.07.1998 | |
BE | 29.07.1998 | ||
PT | 29.10.1998 | ||
SE | 29.10.1998 | ||
LU | 30.11.1998 | ||
Former [1999/29] | AT | 29.07.1998 | |
BE | 29.07.1998 | ||
PT | 29.10.1998 | ||
SE | 29.10.1998 | ||
Former [1999/27] | AT | 29.07.1998 | |
BE | 29.07.1998 | ||
Former [1999/22] | AT | 29.07.1998 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4083829 (CALUNDANN GORDON W, et al)[A] 18-21,23,24,43-46,48,49; | [Y]US5206291 (STEWART MARK E [US]) [Y] 9-14,34-39 | [XY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN [X] 1-8,15-33,40-49 [Y] 9-14,34-39 |