EP0731999 - ENVIRONMENTAL SEAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.05.1999 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 06.02.2008 [2008/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states N.V. RAYCHEM S.A. Diestsesteenweg 692 3010 Kessel-Lo / BE | [1996/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NOLF, Jean-Marie, Etienne 89 Bierbeekstraat B-3360 Korbeek-Lo / BE | [1996/38] | Representative(s) | Clayton-Hathway, Anthony Nicholas, et al Raychem Limited Intellectual Property Law Department Faraday Road Dorcan, Swindon Wiltshire SN3 5HH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/38] | Clayton, Anthony Nicholas, et al Raychem Limited Intellectual Property Law Dept. Faraday Road Dorcan Swindon, Wiltshire SN3 5HH / GB | Application number, filing date | 95902201.3 | 30.11.1994 | [1996/38] | WO1994GB02623 | Priority number, date | GB19930024665 | 01.12.1993 Original published format: GB 9324665 | [1996/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9515601 | Date: | 08.06.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0731999 | Date: | 18.09.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.06.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0731999 | Date: | 15.07.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.06.1995 | Classification | IPC: | H02G15/013 | [1996/38] | CPC: |
H02G15/013 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [1996/38] | Title | German: | ABDICHTUNG GEGEN UMWELTEINFLÜSSE | [1996/38] | English: | ENVIRONMENTAL SEAL | [1996/38] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ETANCHEITE AU MILIEU AMBIANT | [1996/38] | Entry into regional phase | 23.05.1996 | National basic fee paid | 23.05.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.05.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.02.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 23.05.1996 | Examination requested [1996/38] | 03.09.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.03.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.09.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.01.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.04.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 14.04.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.04.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 15.07.1998 | BE | 15.07.1998 | CH | 15.07.1998 | GR | 15.07.1998 | IT | 15.07.1998 | LI | 15.07.1998 | NL | 15.07.1998 | DK | 15.10.1998 | PT | 15.10.1998 | SE | 15.10.1998 | IE | 30.11.1998 | [2008/06] |
Former [2003/45] | AT | 15.07.1998 | |
BE | 15.07.1998 | ||
CH | 15.07.1998 | ||
GR | 15.07.1998 | ||
LI | 15.07.1998 | ||
NL | 15.07.1998 | ||
DK | 15.10.1998 | ||
PT | 15.10.1998 | ||
SE | 15.10.1998 | ||
IE | 30.11.1998 | ||
Former [2003/08] | AT | 15.07.1998 | |
BE | 15.07.1998 | ||
CH | 15.07.1998 | ||
GR | 15.07.1998 | ||
LI | 15.07.1998 | ||
NL | 15.07.1998 | ||
PT | 15.10.1998 | ||
SE | 15.10.1998 | ||
IE | 30.11.1998 | ||
Former [2001/23] | AT | 15.07.1998 | |
BE | 15.07.1998 | ||
CH | 15.07.1998 | ||
GR | 15.07.1998 | ||
LI | 15.07.1998 | ||
PT | 15.10.1998 | ||
SE | 15.10.1998 | ||
IE | 30.11.1998 | ||
Former [2000/52] | AT | 15.07.1998 | |
BE | 15.07.1998 | ||
CH | 15.07.1998 | ||
LI | 15.07.1998 | ||
PT | 15.10.1998 | ||
SE | 15.10.1998 | ||
IE | 30.11.1998 | ||
Former [2000/50] | AT | 15.07.1998 | |
BE | 15.07.1998 | ||
PT | 15.10.1998 | ||
SE | 15.10.1998 | ||
CH | 20.10.1998 | ||
LI | 20.10.1998 | ||
IE | 30.11.1998 | ||
Former [2000/27] | AT | 15.07.1998 | |
BE | 15.07.1998 | ||
PT | 15.10.1998 | ||
SE | 15.10.1998 | ||
IE | 30.11.1998 | ||
Former [1999/29] | AT | 15.07.1998 | |
BE | 15.07.1998 | ||
PT | 15.10.1998 | ||
SE | 15.10.1998 | ||
Former [1999/27] | AT | 15.07.1998 | |
BE | 15.07.1998 | ||
Former [1999/22] | AT | 15.07.1998 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2740825 (RIFENBURG RAY C) [A] 1,13-15 * the whole document *; | [A]US3339011 (EWERS JR WILLIAM A, et al) [A] 1,14-16 * column 2, line 20 - column 3, line 2 * * column 3, line 56 - column 4, line 6; figures 1,2 *; | [AD]EP0289981 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [AD] 1,14-16* column 4, line 22 - column 5, line 41; figures 1-4 *; | [AD]WO9219034 (RAYCHEM LTD [GB], et al) [AD] 1,14-16 * abstract * * page 20, paragraph L * * page 24, paragraph 2; figures 1,11A-11D *; | [A]WO9303302 (RAYCHEM LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1,14-16 * page 11, paragraph 1 2; figure 1 * |