Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0733001
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
23.07.1999 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 08.09.1999 [1999/36] |
31.07.1998 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 16.09.1998 [1998/38] |
05.06.1998 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
06.03.1998 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
06.03.1998 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
22.12.1997 |
Renewal fee |
|
05.12.1997 |
First examination report |
|
04.12.1997 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
08.01.1997 |
Renewal fee |
|
09.08.1996 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 25.09.1996 [1996/39] |
09.08.1996 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 25.09.1996 [1996/39] |
26.07.1996 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
24.05.1996 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|