EP0733001 - SETTING DEVICE FOR A VENTILATION FLAP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.07.1999 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.09.1999 [1999/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Behr GmbH & Co. Mauserstrasse 3 70469 Stuttgart / DE | For all designated states SAIA AG Industrie-Elektronik und Komponenten CH-3280 Murten / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1996/39] | For all designated states Behr GmbH & Co. Mauserstrasse 3 D-70469 Stuttgart / DE | ||
For all designated states SAIA AG Industrie-Elektronik und Komponenten CH-3280 Murten / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOILLAT, Pierre 20 Fin de Meyriez CH-3280 Murten / CH | 02 /
MARTIN, Ralf Am Römergraben 3 D-71726 Benningen / DE | 03 /
PORTMANN, Urs Route des Dailles 32 CH-1752 Villars-sur-Glane / CH | 04 /
RICHTER, Christian Altleuben 2 D-01257 Dresden / DE | 05 /
SCHOLZ, Rudolf Spitzbergstrasse 8 D-01219 Dresden / DE | 06 /
SECZER, Leopold In der Eichelgärten 11 D-71729 Erdmannshausen / DE | [1996/39] | Representative(s) | Riedel, Peter, et al Patent- und Rechtsanwalts-Kanzlei Dipl.-Ing. W. Jackisch & Partner Menzelstrasse 40 70192 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/39] | Riedel, Peter, et al c/o Patentanwalt Dipl.-Ing. W. Jackisch & Partner Menzelstrasse 40 70192 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 95902792.1 | 12.12.1994 | [1996/39] | WO1994EP04120 | Priority number, date | DE19934343385 | 18.12.1993 Original published format: DE 4343385 | [1996/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9516582 | Date: | 22.06.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0733001 | Date: | 25.09.1996 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.06.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0733001 | Date: | 16.09.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.06.1995 | Classification | IPC: | B60H1/24 | [1996/39] | CPC: |
B60H1/00835 (EP,US);
F24F11/74 (EP,US);
F24F13/1426 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [1996/39] | Title | German: | STELLVORRICHTUNG FÜR EINE LUFTSTRÖMUNGSKLAPPE | [1996/39] | English: | SETTING DEVICE FOR A VENTILATION FLAP | [1996/39] | French: | SYSTEME D'AJUSTEMENT POUR UN VOLET D'ECOULEMENT D'AIR | [1996/39] | Entry into regional phase | 18.07.1996 | National basic fee paid | 18.07.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.07.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.06.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 18.07.1996 | Examination requested [1996/39] | 09.12.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.03.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.05.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 16.05.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.06.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DE2817297 (ROCKWELL GOLDE GMBH)[A] 1; | [A]DE3047426 (SUEDDEUTSCHE KUEHLER BEHR [DE]) [A] 1; | [A]DE3110949 (PORSCHE AG [DE]) [A] 1; | [A]DE3806307 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1 |