EP0685561 - REAGENT FOR ASSAYING CREATINE KINASE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.02.2003 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IATRON LABORATORIES, INC. 11-4 Higashi-Kanda 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1995/49] | For all designated states IATRON LABORATORIES, INC. 11-4 Higashi-Kanda 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TSUBOTA, Hiroyuki Iatron Laboratories, Inc. 11-4, Higashi-kanda 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101 / JP | 02 /
SHIMADA, Reiko Iatron Laboratories, Inc. 11-4, Higashi-kanda 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101 / JP | [1995/49] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [1995/49] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 D-81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95902987.7 | 19.12.1994 | [1995/49] | WO1994JP02136 | Priority number, date | JP19930344824 | 20.12.1993 Original published format: JP 34482493 | [1995/49] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9517520 | Date: | 29.06.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0685561 | Date: | 06.12.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.06.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0685561 | Date: | 03.04.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 29.06.1995 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.08.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/50, C12Q1/48, C12Q1/32, C12Q1/54 | [1995/49] | CPC: |
C12Q1/50 (EP,KR,US);
C12Q1/54 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1995/49] | Title | German: | REAGENZ ZUR BESTIMMUNG DER KREATINKINASE | [1995/49] | English: | REAGENT FOR ASSAYING CREATINE KINASE | [1995/49] | French: | REACTIF UTILISE POUR DOSER LA CREATINE-KINASE | [1995/49] | Entry into regional phase | 18.09.1995 | Translation filed | 18.09.1995 | National basic fee paid | 18.09.1995 | Search fee paid | 18.09.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.09.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.09.1995 | Examination requested [1995/49] | 08.08.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.12.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.03.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 30.07.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 20.08.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.11.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 23.11.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.01.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH04287698 ; | [A]EP0339814 (UNITIKA LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 92, no. 47, Database accession no. 92-387574, XP002070466 & JPH04287698 A 00000000 (UNITIKA LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * | International search | [A]JPH0534960B |