EP0734628 - TELEVISION PROGRAMS MANAGEMENT SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1996/40] | TELEVISION PROGRAMME MANAGEMENT SYSTEM | ||
[1998/34] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.01.2000 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.01.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.02.2000 [2000/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Henley Trading Limited St. Andrew's House, 2nd floor, 28/30 Exchequer Street Dublin 2 / IE | [1996/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GORETA, Lucas 285, cours Lafayette F-69006 Lyon / FR | [1996/40] | Representative(s) | Bratel, Gérard, et al Cabinet Germain & Maureau 12, rue Boileau BP 6153 69466 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1996/40] | Bratel, Gérard, et al Cabinet GERMAIN & MAUREAU B.P. 3011 69392 Lyon Cédex 03 / FR | Application number, filing date | 95903395.2 | 12.12.1994 | [1996/40] | WO1994FR01452 | Priority number, date | FR19930015515 | 15.12.1993 Original published format: FR 9315515 | [1996/40] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9517074 | Date: | 22.06.1995 | Language: | FR | [1995/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0734628 | Date: | 02.10.1996 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.06.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0734628 | Date: | 03.03.1999 | Language: | FR | [1999/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.06.1995 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/087, H04N5/445 | [1996/40] | CPC: |
H04N21/812 (EP,US);
H04N21/458 (EP,US);
H04N5/50 (EP,US);
H04N7/0882 (EP,US);
H04N7/0887 (EP,US);
H04N2007/1739 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, GB, IT [1996/40] | Title | German: | VERWALTUNGSSYSTEM FÜR FERNSEHPROGRAMME | [1996/40] | English: | TELEVISION PROGRAMS MANAGEMENT SYSTEM | [1998/34] | French: | SYSTEME DE GESTION DE PROGRAMMES DE TELEVISION | [1996/40] |
Former [1996/40] | TELEVISION PROGRAMME MANAGEMENT SYSTEM | Entry into regional phase | 02.07.1996 | National basic fee paid | 02.07.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.07.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.07.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 02.07.1996 | Examination requested [1996/40] | 09.09.1997 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 29.09.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.09.1997 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 06.02.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.02.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.06.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.07.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.09.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.11.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 02.11.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.12.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DYA]WO9100670 (SUPERGUIDE CORP [US]) [DY] 1 * the whole document * [A] 2-9; | [YA]WO9320654 (JENSEN ERIK [DK], et al) [Y] 1 * page 9, line 23 - page 11, line 18 * [A] 2-9; | [DYA]EP0460520 (GRUNDIG EMV [DE]) [DY] 1 * column 2, line 19 - column 3, line 36 * [A] 2-9; | [DA]EP0503070 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [DA] 1 * column 4, line 54 - column 6, line 35 * [A] 2-9; | [A]US4706121 (YOUNG PATRICK [US]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]US5236199 (THOMPSON JR JOHN W [US]) [A] 8,9 * abstract *; | [A]US4995077 (MALINOWSKI IGOR P [US]) [A] 8,9 * abstract *; | [A]EP0059666 (FRANCE ETAT [FR], et al) [A] 1-9 * page 3, line 29 - page 4, line 19 * * page 6, line 6 - page 7, column 21 *; | [DA]EP0572090 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL]) [DA] 1-8 * column 3, line 25 - line 55 * * column 4, line 39 - column 5, line 34 *; | [A]EP0488379 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 7 * figure 1A *; | [A]US4792849 (MCCALLEY KARL W [US], et al) [A] 8,9 * abstract *; | [A]US5186471 (VANCRAEYNEST JAN [US]) [A] 8,9 * abstract * |