Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH09509142 | Global Dossier | 16.09.1997 | A | Priority number | Date | US9413542 | 22.11.1994 | US15800193 | 24.11.1993 | US28686194 | 04.08.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0906919 | Global Dossier | 21.04.1999 | A3 | EP0906919 | 07.04.1999 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US15800193 | 24.11.1993 | EP95903595 | 22.11.1994 | US28686194 | 04.08.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU682561B | Global Dossier | 09.10.1997 | B2 | AU1259695 | 13.06.1995 | A | Priority number | Date | US9413542 | 22.11.1994 | US15800193 | 24.11.1993 | US28686194 | 04.08.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0730607 | Global Dossier | 30.05.2001 | B1 | EP0730607 | 11.09.1996 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US9413542 | 22.11.1994 | US15800193 | 24.11.1993 | US28686194 | 04.08.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2177070 | 01.06.1995 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US9413542 | 22.11.1994 | US15800193 | 24.11.1993 | US28686194 | 04.08.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69427370T | 18.04.2002 | T2 | DE69427370D1 | 05.07.2001 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US9413542 | 22.11.1994 | US15800193 | 24.11.1993 | US28686194 | 04.08.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7067619 | 27.06.2006 | B2 | US2002103130 | 01.08.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US36459799 | 30.07.1999 | US15800193 | 24.11.1993 | US28686194 | 04.08.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5627263 | 06.05.1997 | A | Priority number | Date | US15800193 | 24.11.1993 | US42523895 | 18.04.1995 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9514714 | Global Dossier | 01.06.1995 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US15800193 | 24.11.1993 | US28686194 | 04.08.1994 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5981478 | 09.11.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | US15800193 | 24.11.1993 | US28686194 | 04.08.1994 | Type | Divisional application | EP0906919 |