Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2724122B | Global Dossier | 09.03.1998 | B2 | JPH07232514 | 05.09.1995 | A | Priority number | Date | JP32292494 | 26.12.1994 | JP33377993 | 27.12.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU1281695 | Global Dossier | 17.07.1995 | A | Priority number | Date | JP9402229 | 26.12.1994 | JP33377993 | 27.12.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0686098 | Global Dossier | 18.11.1998 | B1 | EP0686098 | 13.12.1995 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP9402229 | 26.12.1994 | JP33377993 | 27.12.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69414692T | 08.04.1999 | T2 | DE69414692D1 | 24.12.1998 | D1 | Priority number | Date | JP9402229 | 26.12.1994 | JP33377993 | 27.12.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100335738B | 27.09.2002 | B1 | KR960700911 | 24.02.1996 | A | Priority number | Date | JP9402229 | 26.12.1994 | JP33377993 | 27.12.1993 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9518022 | Global Dossier | 06.07.1995 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP33377993 | 27.12.1993 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2156392 | 06.07.1995 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP33377993 | 27.12.1993 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1054342C | 12.07.2000 | C | CN1118589 | 13.03.1996 | A | Priority number | Date | JP33377993 | 27.12.1993 |