EP0687538 - RESIN COMPOSITION FOR A MOLD, MOLD AND MOLDING METHOD USING THE SAME MOLD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.01.2003 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 06.02.2008 [2008/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Otsuka Kagaku Kabushiki Kaisha 2-27, Otedori 3-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka-fu 540 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2002/13] | For all designated states OTSUKA KAGAKU KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-27, Otedori 3-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka-fu 540 / JP | ||
Former [1995/51] | For all designated states OTSUKA KAGAKU KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-27, Ote-dori 3-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka-fu 540 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ICHIKAWA, Yasuhiko 503-4, Yamada Itsukaichi-machi Nishitama-gun Tokyo 190-01 / JP | 02 /
SAKANE, Koji 2-3-21-209, Ogi Higashinada-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo 658 / JP | 03 /
TSUJIKAWA, Yozoburo 129-49, Azamiyanonishi Kitahama Muya-cho Naruto-shi Tokushima 772 / JP | 04 /
TASAKA, Takio 332-9, Azahachikitakaitaku Sasakino Matsushige-cho Itano-gun Tokushima 771-02 / JP | [1995/51] | Representative(s) | Barz, Peter Meissner Bolte & Partner GbR Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/51] | Barz, Peter, Dr. Patentanwalt Kaiserplatz 2 D-80803 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95904029.6 | 28.12.1994 | [1995/51] | WO1994JP02300 | Priority number, date | JP19940000319 | 06.01.1994 Original published format: JP 31994 | JP19940028365 | 25.02.1994 Original published format: JP 2836594 | [1995/51] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9518708 | Date: | 13.07.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0687538 | Date: | 20.12.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.07.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0687538 | Date: | 27.03.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 13.07.1995 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.09.1996 | Classification | IPC: | B29C33/38 | [1995/51] | CPC: |
B29C33/30 (EP,US);
B29C33/3807 (EP,US);
B29C33/448 (EP,US);
B29C45/1703 (EP,US);
B29K2023/00 (EP,US);
B29K2055/02 (EP,US);
B29K2059/00 (EP,US);
B29K2077/00 (EP,US);
B29K2079/085 (EP,US);
B29K2081/04 (EP,US);
B29K2105/08 (EP,US);
B29K2105/126 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1995/51] | Title | German: | HARZZUSAMMENSETZUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER FORM, FORM UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERWENDUNG DIESER FORM | [1995/51] | English: | RESIN COMPOSITION FOR A MOLD, MOLD AND MOLDING METHOD USING THE SAME MOLD | [1995/51] | French: | COMPOSITION DE RESINE POUR FABRIQUER UN MOULE, MOULE ET PROCEDE DE MOULAGE UTILISANT CE MOULE | [1995/51] | Entry into regional phase | 25.08.1995 | Translation filed | 25.08.1995 | National basic fee paid | 25.08.1995 | Search fee paid | 25.08.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.09.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.09.1995 | Examination requested [1995/51] | 10.03.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.09.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.10.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.05.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.06.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.12.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.09.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.10.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.08.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.09.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.12.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 17.12.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.12.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 27.03.2002 | GB | 28.12.2002 | [2008/06] |
Former [2004/22] | GB | 28.12.2002 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0560011 (HUELS CHEMISCHE WERKE AG [DE]) [X] 1-7 * page 3, line 54 - line 55; claims 1,8 *; | [Y]DE1779748 (UNION CARBIDE CORP) [Y] 1-7 * page 13, paragraph 2 - page 15, paragraph 3; claims 1-4 *; | [Y]EP0459229 (BAYER AG [DE]) [Y] 1-7 * page 2, line 35 - line 41; example 5; claim 1 *; | [PA]WO9417140 (OTSUKA KAGAKU KK [JP], et al) [PA] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0528581 (MITSUBISHI GAS CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [A] 1-5 * page 3, line 38 - page 4, line 19; table 3 *; | [A]US4626564 (SAITO TERUO [JP], et al) [A] 1-5 * claim 1; table 1 *; | [A]JPS63202411 ; | [PA]KR930010552B ; | [A]EP0112018 (HODOGAYA CHEMICAL CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * claims 1-4 * | [ ] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 94, no. 32, Database accession no. 94-264066 [ ] * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 88, no. 39, Database accession no. 88-275354, & JPS63202411 A 19880822 (MATSUSHITA ELEC WORKS) [A] 1,6 * abstract * | [PA] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 94, no. 39, Database accession no. 94-314373, & KR930010552B B1 19931028 (KIM S) [PA] 1 * abstract * | International search | [Y]JPS63273650 (INOUE JAPAX RES); | [A]JPH05124042 (TOYO BOSEKI); | [A]JPS51119765 (KURARAY CO) |