EP0734641 - PORTABLE MEDICAL PANORAMIC RADIOGRAPHIC DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.11.2004 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.11.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.01.2005 [2005/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MEDICAL UNIVERSITY OF SOUTH CAROLINA 171 Ashley Avenue Charleston, SC 29425-2232 / US | [1996/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DANIEL, Charles R. 83 Ashley Avenue Charleston, SC 29401 / US | [1996/40] | Representative(s) | Brunner, Michael John Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/40] | Brunner, Michael John GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 95904065.0 | 18.11.1994 | [1996/40] | WO1994US13144 | Priority number, date | US19930154978 | 19.11.1993 Original published format: US 154978 | [1996/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9514365 | Date: | 26.05.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0734641 | Date: | 02.10.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.05.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0734641 | Date: | 21.01.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 26.05.1995 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.04.1998 | Classification | IPC: | H05G1/02, A61B6/14 | [1998/21] | CPC: |
A61B6/51 (EP,US);
A61B6/4405 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1996/40] | H05G1/02 | Designated contracting states | DE, DK, FR [1996/40] | Title | German: | TRAGBARES, MEDIZINISCHES PANORAMA-RÖNTGENGERÄT | [1996/40] | English: | PORTABLE MEDICAL PANORAMIC RADIOGRAPHIC DEVICE | [1996/40] | French: | DISPOSITIF MEDICAL RADIOGRAPHIQUE, PANORAMIQUE ET PORTABLE | [2003/09] |
Former [1996/40] | DISPOSITIF RADIOGRAPHIQUE PANORAMIQUE MEDICAL PORTABLE | Entry into regional phase | 31.05.1996 | National basic fee paid | 31.05.1996 | Search fee paid | 31.05.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.05.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.06.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 31.05.1996 | Examination requested [1996/40] | 18.06.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.12.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.03.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.09.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 04.09.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP03101885.6 / EP1346690 | Opposition(s) | 22.10.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 07.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 07.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.1997 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   24.12.1997 | 30.11.1999 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   19.05.2000 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2798958 (HUDSON DONALD C, et al); | [A]US2939008 (GOODFRIEND DAVID J); | [A]US3617742 (SCHULMAN MARTIN L, et al); | [A]US5199060 (KATO KUNITAKA [JP]) |