EP0680605 - ENTRAPMENT OF NUCLEIC ACID SEQUENCING TEMPLATE IN SAMPLE MIXTURES BY ENTANGLED POLYMER NETWORKS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.12.2002 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): DK | published on 05.11.2003 [2003/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PE Corporation (NY) 850 Lincoln Centre Drive Foster City California 94404 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/18] | For all designated states PE Corporation (NY) 850 Lincoln Centre Drive Foster City California 94404 / US | ||
Former [1996/10] | For all designated states THE PERKIN-ELMER CORPORATION Applied Biosystems Division 850 Lincoln Centre Drive Foster City California 94404 / US | ||
Former [1995/45] | For all designated states PERKIN-ELMER CORPORATION Applied Biosystems Division, 850 Lincoln Centre Drive Foster City, CA 94404 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JOHNSON, Ben, F. 957 Clara Drive Palo Alto, CA 94303 / US | [1995/45] | Representative(s) | West, Alan Harry, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/45] | West, Alan Harry, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 95904142.7 | 22.11.1994 | [1995/45] | WO1994US13605 | Priority number, date | US19930156218 | 23.11.1993 Original published format: US 156218 | [1995/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9514922 | Date: | 01.06.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0680605 | Date: | 08.11.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.06.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0680605 | Date: | 30.01.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.06.1995 | Classification | IPC: | G01N27/447, C12Q1/68 | [1995/45] | CPC: |
G01N27/44743 (EP);
C12N15/101 (EP);
C12Q1/6869 (EP);
G01N27/44747 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1995/45] | Title | German: | EINSCHLIESSEN VON MATRIZEN ZUR SEQUENZIERUNG VON NUKLEINSAEUREN IN PROBENMISCHUNGEN BEI VERFLOCHTENEN POLYMERNETZWERKEN | [2002/03] | English: | ENTRAPMENT OF NUCLEIC ACID SEQUENCING TEMPLATE IN SAMPLE MIXTURES BY ENTANGLED POLYMER NETWORKS | [1995/45] | French: | CAPTURE D'UNE MATRICE DE SEQUEN AGE D'ACIDES NUCLEIQUES DANS DES MELANGES D'ECHANTILLONS PAR DES RESEAUX DE POLYMERE ENCHEVETRE | [1995/45] |
Former [1995/45] | EINSCHLIESSEN VON MATRIZEN ZUR SEQUENZIERUNG VON NUKLEINSAUREN IN PROBENMISCHUNGEN BEI VERFLOCHTENEN POLYMERNETZWERKEN | Entry into regional phase | 18.08.1995 | National basic fee paid | 18.08.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.11.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.11.1995 | Examination requested [1996/02] | 24.06.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.01.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.09.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.01.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.04.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 01.06.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.08.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 24.08.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.10.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 03.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 30.01.2002 | BE | 30.01.2002 | DK | 30.04.2002 | [2003/45] |
Former [2003/09] | AT | 30.01.2002 | |
BE | 30.01.2002 | ||
Former [2003/06] | BE | 30.01.2002 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0162657 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1* abstract *; | [A]US4911807 (BURD SAMUEL [US]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]EP0459241 (MILLIPORE CORP [US]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]EP0471949 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]EP0497448 (BECKMAN INSTRUMENTS INC [US]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]EP0500211 (BECKMAN INSTRUMENTS INC [US]) [A] 1 * abstract * |