EP0732006 - MINIMAL FUNCTION REMOTE CONTROL WITHOUT DIGIT KEYS AND WITH A POWER TOGGLE PROGRAM AND WITH A CHANNEL ROTATION PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.09.2006 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.09.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.10.2006 [2006/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UNIVERSAL ELECTRONICS, INC. 1864 Enterprise Parkway Twinsburg Ohio 44087 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2005/43] | For all designated states UNIVERSAL ELECTRONICS, INC. 1864 Enterprise Parkway Twinsburg Ohio 44087 / US | ||
Former [1996/38] | For all designated states UNIVERSAL ELECTRONICS, INC. 1864 Enterprise Parkway Twinsburg, Ohio 44087 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BUYS, Menno, F. Walnootstraat 67 NL-7556 DL Hengelo / NL | 02 /
HAYES, Patrick, F. 26451 Avenida Deseo Mission Viejo, CA 92691 / US | 03 /
NGUYEN, Kimthoa 5671 Lynnbrook Plaza Yorba Linda, CA 92686 / US | [1996/38] | Representative(s) | Rees, David Christopher, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/48] | Rees, David Christopher, et al Kilburn & Strode 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | ||
Former [1999/26] | Schuhmann, Albrecht Tristanstrasse 5 90461 Nürnberg / DE | ||
Former [1999/09] | Rauh, Helga Wielandstrasse 4 90419 Nürnberg / DE | ||
Former [1996/38] | Merten, Fritz Patentanwalt Tristanstrasse 5 90461 Nürnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 95904148.4 | 28.11.1994 | [1996/38] | WO1994US13632 | Priority number, date | US19930158601 | 29.11.1993 Original published format: US 158601 | [1996/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9515028 | Date: | 01.06.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0732006 | Date: | 18.09.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.06.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0732006 | Date: | 26.10.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.06.1995 | Classification | IPC: | H03J1/00 | [1996/38] | CPC: |
H03J7/18 (EP,US);
H03J1/0025 (EP,US);
H01H9/0235 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1996/38] | Title | German: | MINIMALFUNKTIONSFERNBEDIENUNG OHNE ZIFFERNTASTEN MIT EINEM EIN/AUS-KIPPPROGRAMM UND EINEM KANALROTIERPROGRAMM | [1996/38] | English: | MINIMAL FUNCTION REMOTE CONTROL WITHOUT DIGIT KEYS AND WITH A POWER TOGGLE PROGRAM AND WITH A CHANNEL ROTATION PROGRAM | [1996/38] | French: | TELECOMMANDE A FONCTIONS MINIMALES SANS TOUCHES DE CHIFFRES ET AVEC UN PROGRAMME DE BASCULE D'ACTIVATION ET UN PROGRAMME DE ROTATION DES CANAUX | [1996/38] | Entry into regional phase | 21.06.1996 | National basic fee paid | 21.06.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.06.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.06.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 21.06.1996 | Examination requested [1996/38] | 06.07.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.11.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.06.2000 | Date of oral proceedings | 28.07.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 28.07.2000 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 26.02.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.07.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.06.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.12.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 03.12.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Appeal following examination | 26.09.2000 | Appeal received | 27.11.2000 | Statement of grounds filed | 05.03.2001 | Interlocutory revision of appeal | Divisional application(s) | EP00113667.0 / EP1073200 | EP00202239.0 Application deemed to be withdrawn : 29.07.2000 | Opposition(s) | 27.07.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 03.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 21.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 22.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]GB2218234 (THOMSON CONSUMER ELECTRONICS [US]) [A] 1-8 * page 4, line 20 - line 30 *; | [A]EP0435370 (PHILIPS NV [NL]) [A] 1-8 * column 5, line 26 - line 36 *; | [A]US3886307 (EVANS WAYNE WHEELER, et al) [A] 1 * column A * |