EP0737084 - SLIP-LAYERED CATHETER BALLOON [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.01.2004 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.01.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.03.2004 [2004/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BOSTON SCIENTIFIC CORPORATION One Boston Scientific Place Natick, MA 01760-1537 / US | [1996/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WANG, James, C. 15 Massasoit Avenue Norton, MA 02766 / US | 02 /
CHIN, Yem 35 University Avenue Burlington, MA 01803 / US | [1996/42] | Representative(s) | Williams, Ceili, et al Stevens Hewlett & Perkins 1 St Augustine's Place Bristol BS1 4UD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/17] | Williams, Ceili, et al Stevens Hewlett & Perkins Halton House 20/23 Holborn London EC1N 2JD / GB | ||
Former [2000/37] | Gaunt, Robert John, et al Stevens, Hewlett & Perkins Halton House 20/23 Holborn London EC1N 2JD / GB | ||
Former [1996/42] | Gilding, Martin John Eric Potter & Clarkson St. Mary's Court St. Mary's Gate Nottingham NG1 1LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 95904313.4 | 09.12.1994 | [1996/42] | WO1994US14199 | Priority number, date | US19930174680 | 28.12.1993 Original published format: US 174680 | [1996/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9517920 | Date: | 06.07.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0737084 | Date: | 16.10.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.07.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0737084 | Date: | 19.03.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 06.07.1995 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.02.1998 | Classification | IPC: | A61M29/00 | [1996/42] | CPC: |
A61M25/0045 (EP);
A61M25/1029 (EP);
A61M25/1034 (EP);
A61M25/1038 (EP);
A61M25/104 (EP);
A61M2025/1075 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1996/42] | Title | German: | BALLONKATHETER MIT GLEITLAGEN | [1996/42] | English: | SLIP-LAYERED CATHETER BALLOON | [1996/42] | French: | BALLONNET DE CATHETER A COUCHES GLISSANT ENTRE ELLES | [1996/42] | Entry into regional phase | 12.07.1996 | National basic fee paid | 12.07.1996 | Search fee paid | 12.07.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.07.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.06.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed | 12.07.1996 | Examination requested [1996/42] | 27.10.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.02.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.07.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.12.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.05.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.10.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.12.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 02.12.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.12.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 04.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US4932956 (REDDY ET AL.) [X] 1-3,9,14,15 * column A * * column 2, line 56 - column 3, line 6 * * column 4, line 34 - column 5, line 29; figures 2,3; claims 1-3,5-7 * [Y] 4-8,10-13; | [Y]DE3036192 (KÜPPER) [Y] 4,7 * page 8, line 1 - line 25; figures 1,3,4; claims 1,9 *; | [Y]EP0553960 (ADVANCED CARDIOVASCULAR SYSTEM) [Y] 5,6,8 * column A * * column 3, line 31 - line 49 * * column 5, line 43 - line 50; figures 1-3 *; | [Y]US5270086 (HAMLIN) [Y] 10-13 * column A * * column 1, line 67 - column 3, line 45; figures 4-6; claims 9-14 *; | [A]EP0214721 (FRANKLIN MEDICAL LTD.); | [A]EP0380102 (ADVANCED CARDIOVASCULAR SYSTEMS, INC.) | International search | [X]US5061254 ; | [X]US4572186 ; | [X]US2499045 ; | [X]US5232444 ; | [X]SU1069826 |