EP0735982 - PROCESS FOR PRODUCING C 1 TO C 4 MONOPERCARBOXYLIC ACID AND C 4 TO C 18 DIPERCARBOXYLIC ACID COMPLEXES BY THE FLUIDISED BED PROCESS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1996/41] | PROCESS FOR PRODUCING HYDROGEN PEROXIDE, C 1? TO C 4? MONOPERCARBOXYLIC ACID AND C 4? TO C 18? DIPERCARBOXYLIC ACID COMPLEXES BY THE FLUIDISED BED PROCESS | ||
[1999/16] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.02.2000 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 30.07.2008 [2008/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | [2008/31] |
Former [1996/41] | For all designated states BASF AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BREITENBACH, Jörg Am Kaiserberg 14 D-53545 Linz / DE | 02 /
GRABOWSKI, Sven Pfalzgrafenstrasse 53 D-67061 Ludwigshafen / DE | 03 /
SANNER, Axel Lorscher Ring 2c D-67227 Frankenthal / DE | [1996/41] | Application number, filing date | 95904453.8 | 10.12.1994 | [1996/41] | WO1994EP04115 | Priority number, date | DE19934344131 | 23.12.1993 Original published format: DE 4344131 | [1996/41] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9517345 | Date: | 29.06.1995 | [1995/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0735982 | Date: | 09.10.1996 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.06.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0735982 | Date: | 21.04.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.08.1995 | Classification | IPC: | C01B15/037, C08K5/14, C08K3/20, C07C407/00, C07C409/24, C07C409/26 | [1996/41] | CPC: |
C07C407/00 (EP,US);
C01B15/01 (EP,US);
C07C409/24 (EP,US);
C07C409/26 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C07C407/00, C07C409/24 (EP,US);
C07C407/00, C07C409/26 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1996/41] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON C 1- BIS C 4-MONOPERCARBONSÄURE- UND C 4- BIS C 18-DIPERCARBONSÄURE-KOMPLEXEN IM WIRBELSCHICHTVERFAHREN | [1999/16] | English: | PROCESS FOR PRODUCING C 1 TO C 4 MONOPERCARBOXYLIC ACID AND C 4 TO C 18 DIPERCARBOXYLIC ACID COMPLEXES BY THE FLUIDISED BED PROCESS | [1999/16] | French: | PROCEDE DE FABRICATION DE COMPLEXES D'ACIDES MONOPERCARBOXYLIQUES C 1 A C 4 ET D'ACIDES DIPERCARBOXYLIQUES C 4 A C 18 SELON LA TECHNIQUE EN LIT FLUIDISE | [1999/16] |
Former [1996/41] | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON WASSERSTOFFPEROXID-, C 1?- BIS C 4?-MONOPERCARBONSÄURE- UND C 4?- BIS C 18?-DIPERCARBONSÄURE-KOMPLEXEN IM WIRBELSCHICHTVERFAHREN | ||
Former [1996/41] | PROCESS FOR PRODUCING HYDROGEN PEROXIDE, C 1? TO C 4? MONOPERCARBOXYLIC ACID AND C 4? TO C 18? DIPERCARBOXYLIC ACID COMPLEXES BY THE FLUIDISED BED PROCESS | ||
Former [1996/41] | PROCEDE DE FABRICATION DE COMPLEXES DE PEROXYDE D'HYDROGENE, D'ACIDES MONOPERCARBOXYLIQUES C 1? A C 4? ET D'ACIDES DIPERCARBOXYLIQUES C 4? A C 18? SELON LA TECHNIQUE EN LIT FLUIDISE | Entry into regional phase | 18.06.1996 | National basic fee paid | 18.06.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.06.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.06.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 18.06.1996 | Examination requested [1996/41] | 04.10.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.04.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.03.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.07.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.08.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 26.08.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.01.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 21.04.1999 | GB | 10.12.1999 | DE | 16.12.1999 | BE | 31.12.1999 | CH | 31.12.1999 | LI | 31.12.1999 | [2003/08] |
Former [2002/09] | GB | 10.12.1999 | |
DE | 16.12.1999 | ||
BE | 31.12.1999 | ||
CH | 31.12.1999 | ||
LI | 31.12.1999 | ||
Former [2002/02] | GB | 10.12.1999 | |
BE | 31.12.1999 | ||
CH | 31.12.1999 | ||
LI | 31.12.1999 | ||
Former [2001/12] | GB | 10.12.1999 | |
BE | 31.12.1999 | ||
Former [2001/08] | BE | 31.12.1999 | Cited in | International search | [DA]US3480557 (SHIRAEFF DIMITRY ALEXIS) [DA] 2* column 2, line 22 - line 46 *; | [DXA]WO9217158 (ISP INVESTMENTS INC [US]) [DX] 1 * the whole document * * IDEM * [A] 2; | [DX]US5190749 (LOGIN ROBERT B [US], et al) [DX] 1 * column W * |