EP0738355 - IMPROVEMENTS IN OR RELATING TO APPARATUS FOR USE IN FORMING PILES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.05.2000 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 06.02.2008 [2008/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Roxbury Limited 28 Irish Town Gibraltar / GI | [1999/29] |
Former [1999/26] | For all designated states Roxbury Limited 28 Irish Town / GI | ||
Former [1996/43] | For all designated states Roxbury Limited 28 Irish Town / GI | ||
For all designated states BULLIVANT, Roger Alfred Park Manor, Newton Solney Burton-on-Trent, Staffordshire DE15 0SS / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BULLIVANT, Roger Alfred Park Manor, Newton Solney, Nr. Burton-on-Trent Staffordshire DE15 0SS / GB | [1996/43] | Representative(s) | Swindell & Pearson Limited 48 Friar Gate Derby DE1 1GY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/43] | Swindell & Pearson 48 Friar Gate Derby DE1 1GY / GB | Application number, filing date | 95904644.2 | 05.01.1995 | [1996/43] | WO1995GB00010 | Priority number, date | GB19940000140 | 06.01.1994 Original published format: GB 9400140 | GB19940018843 | 19.09.1994 Original published format: GB 9418843 | [1996/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9518892 | Date: | 13.07.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0738355 | Date: | 23.10.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.07.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0738355 | Date: | 21.07.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.07.1995 | Classification | IPC: | E02D5/38, E02D7/22 | [1996/43] | CPC: |
E02D7/22 (EP,US);
E02D5/385 (EP,US);
E02D5/48 (EP,US);
E21B10/44 (EP,US);
E21B7/30 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, NL, PT, SE [1996/43] | Title | German: | VERBESSERUNGEN BETREFFEND EINE VORRICHTUNG ZUM HERSTELLEN VON PFÄHLEN | [1996/43] | English: | IMPROVEMENTS IN OR RELATING TO APPARATUS FOR USE IN FORMING PILES | [1996/43] | French: | AMELIORATIONS RELATIVES A UN DISPOSITIF DESTINE A FORMER DES PILES | [1996/43] | Entry into regional phase | 19.06.1996 | National basic fee paid | 19.06.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.06.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.07.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 19.06.1996 | Examination requested [1996/45] | 07.05.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.09.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.11.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 26.11.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.04.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.01.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 21.07.1999 | ES | 21.07.1999 | GR | 21.07.1999 | IT | 21.07.1999 | SE | 21.07.1999 | PT | 21.10.1999 | DE | 22.10.1999 | [2008/06] |
Former [2004/07] | AT | 21.07.1999 | |
ES | 21.07.1999 | ||
GR | 21.07.1999 | ||
SE | 21.07.1999 | ||
PT | 21.10.1999 | ||
DE | 22.10.1999 | ||
Former [2002/26] | AT | 21.07.1999 | |
ES | 21.07.1999 | ||
SE | 21.07.1999 | ||
PT | 21.10.1999 | ||
DE | 22.10.1999 | ||
Former [2002/23] | AT | 21.07.1999 | |
SE | 21.07.1999 | ||
PT | 21.10.1999 | ||
DE | 22.10.1999 | ||
Former [2000/26] | AT | 21.07.1999 | |
PT | 21.10.1999 | ||
DE | 22.10.1999 | ||
Former [2000/24] | AT | 21.07.1999 | |
DE | 22.10.1999 | ||
Former [2000/23] | DE | 22.10.1999 | Cited in | International search | [YA]DE523177 (SIEMENS BAUUNION GMBH) [Y] 8,11,12,15 * the whole document * [A] 16,21-23,33; | [A]DE1097373 (PIERRE JEAN MARIE THEODORE ALL); | [YA]FR1250513 (RAYMOND INT INC) [Y] 9 * page 8, column R, line 25 - page 9, column R, line 31; figures 14,15 * [A] 1; | [A]BE754765 (FUNDEX PVBA); | [A]DE2206104 (RAYMOND INTERNATIONAL INC.) [A] 27,29,31,35-37 * page 6, line 13 - page 11, line 2; figure - *; | [YA]FR2180405 (STEDING JERRY [US]) [Y] 19 * figure -; claim - * [A] 27,29,31,32,37; | [YA]NL7608927 (FUNDEX PVBA) [Y] 3-5 * the whole document * [A] 20; | [XAY]NL7712013 (WILLIAM F GILLEN JR) [X] 1,6 * page 3, line 4 - page 5, line 22 * * page 6, line 25 - page 13, line 28; figures 1-12 * [A] 2,13,16,24-26 [Y] 3-5,8,9,11,12,15,19; | [A]DE2949938 (BBC BROWN BOVERI & CIE [DE]) [A] 8,10,15,16,21,22,33 * page 10, line 13 - page 13, line 13; figure 1 * |