EP0729602 - LINEAR DIGITAL-ANALOG INTERACTIVE WRISTWATCH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.12.1998 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.12.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.01.1999 [1999/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rosenberg, Burton A. 1053 Marina Heights Road Brookings, OR 97415 / US | [1996/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1996/36] | Representative(s) | Lieck, Hans-Peter BOETERS & LIECK Oberanger 32 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/36] | Lieck, Hans-Peter, Dipl.-Ing. Lieck, Endlich & Partner Widenmayerstrasse 36 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95904749.9 | 16.11.1994 | [1996/36] | WO1994US13334 | Priority number, date | US19930160291 | 19.11.1993 Original published format: US 160291 | [1996/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9514261 | Date: | 26.05.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0729602 | Date: | 04.09.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.05.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0729602 | Date: | 04.02.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.05.1995 | Classification | IPC: | G04G9/00, G04C3/00 | [1996/36] | CPC: |
G04C3/001 (EP,US);
G04G9/0082 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1996/36] | Title | German: | LINEARE DIGITAL-ANALOGE INTERAKTIVE ARMBANDUHR | [1996/36] | English: | LINEAR DIGITAL-ANALOG INTERACTIVE WRISTWATCH | [1996/36] | French: | MONTRE-BRACELET INTERACTIVE NUMERIQUE-ANALOGIQUE A AFFICHAGE LINEAIRE | [1996/36] | Entry into regional phase | 17.05.1996 | National basic fee paid | 17.05.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.05.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.06.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 17.05.1996 | Examination requested [1996/36] | 19.12.1996 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 03.06.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.06.1997 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 03.07.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.10.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 02.10.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.11.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US3772874 (LEFKOWITZ I) [X] 1,2 * figures 1-10 *; | [A]FR2185816 (HABILLEMENT IND HORLOGER SA [CH]) [A] 3,4 * figures 1-5 *; | [A]DE2813234 (HILD MANFRED) [A] 5,6 * figures 3,4 *; | [A]DE3318801 (ELEKTRO RIEDERER GMBH [DE]) [A] 8 * figures 7A-7D *; | [A]DE4241316 (NUVOLA SILVIO [IT]) [A] 1; | [A]US4752919 (CLARK LLOYD D [US]) [A] 1; | [A]GB2052809 (SUWA SEIKOSHA KK) [A] 3 |