EP0686270 - A METHOD OF MANUFACTURING A DIFFRACTIVE SURFACE PROFILE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.09.2002 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester, NY 14650-2201 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester NY 14650-2201 / US | ||
Former [1995/50] | For all designated states EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MEYERS, Mark, Marshall 35 Countryside Drive Hamlin, NY 14464 / US | 02 /
SCHICKLER, Mark, Edward 1262 Laurel Circle Webster, NY 14580 / US | [1995/50] | Representative(s) | Buff, Michel, et al KODAK INDUSTRIE Département Brevets - CRT Zone Industrielle - B.P. 21 71102 Chalon sur Saône Cédex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1995/50] | Buff, Michel, et al Kodak-Pathé Département des Brevets et Licences CRT Centre de Recherches et de Technologie Zone Industrielle F-71102 Chalon sur Saône Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 95904798.6 | 05.12.1994 | [1995/50] | WO1994US13894 | Priority number, date | US19930174737 | 29.12.1993 Original published format: US 174737 | [1995/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9518392 | Date: | 06.07.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0686270 | Date: | 13.12.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.07.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.07.1995 | Classification | IPC: | G02B5/18, B24B13/04 | [1995/50] | CPC: |
G02B5/1852 (EP,US);
B24B13/046 (EP,US);
Y10T407/26 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1995/50] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES DIFFRAKTIVEN OBERFLÄCHENPROFILS | [1995/50] | English: | A METHOD OF MANUFACTURING A DIFFRACTIVE SURFACE PROFILE | [1995/50] | French: | PROCEDE DE FABRICATION D'UN PROFIL DE SURFACE DIFFRACTIVE | [1995/50] | Entry into regional phase | 13.09.1995 | National basic fee paid | 13.09.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.09.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.09.1995 | Examination requested [1995/50] | 13.01.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.06.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.12.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.03.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.10.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.03.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/44] | 28.05.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2002/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2001 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0557057 (HUGHES AIRCRAFT CO [US]) [A] 1,4,7,9,11-15* the whole document * | [A] - ANTIER, "Diffractive Optical Elements in FLIR", THIRD INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON HOLOGRAPHIC SYSTEMS, COMPONENTS AND APPLICATIONS (IEE), EDINBURGH, UK, (19910916), pages 190 - 194 [A] 1,4,7,9,11-15 * the whole document * | [A] - CLARK ET AL, "production of kinoforms by single point diamond machining", OPTICS NEWS, (198912), vol. 12, no. 12, pages 39 - 40 [A] 1,4,5,7,9,11-15 * the whole document * | [A] - LONDONO ET AL, "Athermalization of a Single-Component Lens with Diffractive Optics", APPLIED OPTICS., NEW YORK US, (19930501), vol. 32, no. 13, pages 2295 - 2302 [A] 1,4,5,7,9,11-15 * the whole document * |