EP0737090 - METHOD OF MANUFACTURING A FILTER FOR FLUIDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.01.2002 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.05.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 26.06.2002 [2002/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JACOBI Systemtechnik GmbH An der Priessnitzaue 32 01474 Weissig bei Dresden / DE | [2001/11] |
Former [1997/27] | For all designated states "JACOBI" Systemtechnik GmbH An der Priessnitzaue 32 01474 Weissig bei Dresden / DE | ||
Former [1996/42] | For all designated states Detroit Holding Limited Stratton House, Bishopstown Road Cork / IE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KÄHLER, Kai Thielbek 6 D-20355 Hamburg / DE | [1996/42] | Representative(s) | Meissner Bolte Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/37] | Meissner, Bolte & Partner Anwaltssozietät GbR Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | ||
Former [1996/42] | Christiansen, Henning, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwalt Pacelliallee 43/45 14195 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 95905026.1 | 30.12.1994 | [1996/42] | WO1994DE01556 | Priority number, date | DE19934345129 | 30.12.1993 Original published format: DE 4345129 | [1996/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9517942 | Date: | 06.07.1995 | [1995/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0737090 | Date: | 16.10.1996 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.07.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0737090 | Date: | 14.03.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.07.1995 | Classification | IPC: | B01D29/01, B01D29/07, B01D46/52 | [1996/42] | CPC: |
B01D46/10 (EP,US);
B01D29/012 (EP,US);
B01D29/07 (EP,US);
B01D46/0001 (EP,US);
B01D46/52 (EP,US);
B01D46/523 (EP,US);
B01D2201/127 (EP,US);
B01D2265/04 (EP,US);
Y10T156/1015 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [1996/42] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES FLUIDFILTERS | [1996/42] | English: | METHOD OF MANUFACTURING A FILTER FOR FLUIDS | [1996/42] | French: | PROCEDE DE FABRICATION D'UN FILTRE A FLUIDES | [1996/42] | Entry into regional phase | 19.07.1996 | National basic fee paid | 19.07.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.07.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.07.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 19.07.1996 | Examination requested [1996/42] | 15.12.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.03.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.04.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.09.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.11.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 14.11.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.12.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.03.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.1996 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   19.03.1997 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | PT | 15.06.2001 | [2002/26] | Cited in | International search | [A]US3692184 (MILLER ROBERT B JR, et al) [A] 1 * column 2, paragraph 2 * * column 3, paragraph 3; figure 1 *; | [A]GB2150461 (MARSHALL D A G) [A] 1,17 * page 1, column R, line 84 - line 123; figures 3,4 *; | [AD]EP0377419 (CAMFIL AB [SE]) [AD] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0382331 (LIPPOLD HANS JOACHIM) [A] 1 * abstract ** column 8, line 33 - line 54 * |