EP0735822 - USE OF AT LEAST ONE TERPENIC CARBIDE AND/OR A DERIVATIVE THEREOF AS AN ADDITIVE TO A HERBICIDE SLURRY OR COFORMULANT OF A HERBICIDE COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.02.2001 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 19.02.2003 [2003/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ACTION PIN 30 rue Gambetta 40100 Dax / FR | [1996/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LAULHE, Jean-Paul 14, rue Jean-Jacques-Rousseau F-40990 Saint-Paul-les-Dax / FR | 02 /
DUFAU, Ghislain La Grange aux Palombes, 28, route des Artificiers F-40100 Dax / FR | [1996/41] | Representative(s) | Moncheny, Michel, et al Cabinet Lavoix 2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1996/41] | Moncheny, Michel, et al c/o Cabinet Lavoix 2 Place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 95905169.9 | 26.12.1994 | [1996/41] | WO1994FR01533 | Priority number, date | FR19930015653 | 24.12.1993 Original published format: FR 9315653 | [1996/41] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9517822 | Date: | 06.07.1995 | Language: | FR | [1995/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0735822 | Date: | 09.10.1996 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.07.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0735822 | Date: | 12.04.2000 | Language: | FR | [2000/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.07.1995 | Classification | IPC: | A01N65/00, A01N25/24, A01N49/00 | [1996/41] | CPC: |
A01N65/06 (EP,US);
A01N25/24 (EP,US);
A01N43/00 (EP,US);
A01N65/00 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
A01N43/00, A01N2300/00 (US,EP);
A01N65/00, A01N2300/00 (US,EP);
A01N65/00, A01N47/20, A01N43/76, A01N43/42, A01N43/40, A01N43/12, A01N37/40 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1996/41] | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG VON MINDESTENS EINEM TERPEN UND/ODER SEINER DERIVATE ALS ZUSATZ ZU EINEM HERBIZIDBREI ODER COFORMULIERUNGSMITTEL EINER HERBIZIDKOMPOSITION | [1996/41] | English: | USE OF AT LEAST ONE TERPENIC CARBIDE AND/OR A DERIVATIVE THEREOF AS AN ADDITIVE TO A HERBICIDE SLURRY OR COFORMULANT OF A HERBICIDE COMPOSITION | [1996/41] | French: | UTILISATION D'AU MOINS UN CARBURE TERPENIQUE ET/OU UN DE SES DERIVES EN TANT QU'ADJUVANT D'UNE BOUILLIE HERBICIDE OU COFORMULANT D'UNE COMPOSITION HERBICIDE | [1996/41] | Entry into regional phase | 03.07.1996 | National basic fee paid | 03.07.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.07.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.07.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 03.07.1996 | Examination requested [1996/41] | 03.12.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.05.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.01.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.07.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.05.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 09.09.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 14.10.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.01.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 10.01.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.01.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 12.04.2000 | NL | 12.04.2000 | [2003/08] |
Former [2001/11] | AT | 12.04.2000 | Cited in | International search | [PX]CA2111314 ; | [XY]WO8002360 (SAMPSON M) [XY] 1-17 * page 10, line 1 - page 12, line 4 * * page 5, line 13 - line 15 * * page 1, line 1 - page 2, line 30 *; | [XY]EP0022666 (SAMPSON MICHAEL JAMES) [XY] 1-17 * page 1, line 1 - line 4 * * page 2, line 3 - line 8 * * page 2, line 36 - page 4, line 1 * * page 4, line 2 - line 36 * * page 5, line 35 - page 6, line 33 *; | [XY]EP0027344 (HUTCHINGS N [GB], et al) [XY] 1-17 * page 1, line 16 - line 20 * * page 2, line 4 - line 24 * * page 3, line 6 * * page 5, line 24 - line 32 * * page 6, line 23 - page 7, line 13 *; | [Y]DE3247050 (BAYER AG [DE]) [Y] 8-12 * the whole document *; | [X]GB2134391 (SHELL INT RESEARCH) [X] 1-7,13,14,16,17 * page 1, line 13 - line 15 * * page 2, line 59 - line 63 * * page 3, line 25 - line 36 *; | [A]FR2599592 (DERIVES RESINIQUES TERPENIQUE [FR], et al) [A] 1-12* the whole document *; | [X]US4822407 (ESPOSITO JAMES E [US]) [X] 1-7,13-17 * column 2, line 5 - line 8 * * column 2, line 44 - column 3, line 9 *; | JPH0386802 [ ] (SANYO CHEMICAL IND LTD); | [X]WO9105472 (SAFER INC [US]) [X] 1-3,8-12 * page 3, line 15 - line 22 * * page 4, line 2 - line 4 * * page 4, line 19 - line 32 * * page 5, line 3 - line 20 * * page 6, line 16 - line 20 * * page 7, line 8 - line 10 * * page 7, line 20 - page 8, line 27 * * page 9; table I *; | [Y]WO9319598 (THOMPSON ROBERT VINCENT [NZ]) [Y] 1-17 * page 1, line 3 - line 8 * * page 4, line 12 - line 15 * * page 7, line 4 - line 9 * * page 8, line 8 - line 13 * * page 11, line 11 - line 14 * * page 11, line 19 - line 25 * | [X] - K.KOWANSKI, "Possibility of reducing dosage of pesticides in potato protection", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19950116), vol. 122, no. 3, Database accession no. 25843 [X] 1-6,13,14,16,17 * abstract * | [ ] - MATER.SES.NAUK.INST.OCHR.ROSL., POZNAN, vol. 31, no. 2, pages 66 - 70 | [Y] - C.GAUVRIT ET AL., "Oils for Weed Control: Uses and Mode of Action", PESTICIDE SCIENCE., BARKING GB, vol. 37, page 147 [Y] 1-17 * page 150, column 2, paragraph 2 - page 151, column 1, paragraph 1 * | [Y] - H.MARTIN, THE SCIENTIFIC PRINCIPLES OF PLANT PROTECTION WITH SPECIAL REFERENCE TO CHEMICAL CONTROL, LONDON, GB, E.ARNOLD [Y] 1-17 * page 76, paragraph 3 * * page 80, paragraph 4 - page 81, paragraph 1 * | [X] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19920302), vol. 116, no. 9, Database accession no. 78605 [X] 1-7,13,14,16,17 * abstract * | [PX] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 44, no. 94, Database accession no. 94-310851 [39], & CA2111314 A 19940918 (APPLIED BIOCHEMISTS) [PX] 1-7,13,14,16,17 * abstract * | [A] - S.F.VAUGHN, "Volatile monoterpenes as potential parent structures for new herbicides", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19930816), vol. 119, no. 7, Database accession no. 65585 [A] 1-17 * abstract * | [ ] - WEED SCI., vol. 41, no. 1, pages 114 - 119 |