EP0687353 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR LIQUEFYING NATURAL GAS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 15.08.2003 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2005 | Change: Appeal number | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Institut Français du Pétrole 4, Avenue de Bois Préau 92500 Rueil Malmaison / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1998/46] | For all designated states INSTITUT FRANCAIS DU PETROLE 4, Avenue de Bois Préau 92500 Rueil Malmaison / FR | ||
Former [1995/51] | For all designated states INSTITUT FRANCAIS DU PETROLE 4, Avenue de Bois Préau F-92500 Rueil-Malmaison / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PREVOST, Isabelle 3, impasse de la Gare F-78700 Conflans-Sainte-Honorine / FR | 02 /
ROJEY, Alexandre 52, rue Alexandre-Dumas F-92500 Rueil-Malmaison / FR | [1995/51] | Representative(s) | Kloiber, Thomas, et al Vonnemann Kloiber & Kollegen Sckellstrasse 6 81667 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/15] | Kloiber, Thomas, et al Vonnemann, Kloiber, Lewald, Hübner Belgradstrasse 1 80796 München / DE | ||
Former [2000/29] | Lewald, Dietrich, Dipl.-Ing. Lewald & Partner Patentanwälte Rindermarkt 6 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95905171.5 | 26.12.1994 | [1995/51] | WO1994FR01535 | Priority number, date | FR19930015924 | 30.12.1993 Original published format: FR 9315924 | FR19940002024 | 21.02.1994 Original published format: FR 9402024 | [1995/51] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9518345 | Date: | 06.07.1995 | Language: | FR | [1995/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0687353 | Date: | 20.12.1995 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.07.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0687353 | Date: | 11.11.1998 | Language: | FR | [1998/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.07.1995 | Classification | IPC: | F25J3/06, F25J1/02 | [1995/51] | CPC: |
F25J3/0257 (EP,US);
F25J3/06 (KR);
F25J1/0022 (EP,US);
F25J1/0035 (EP,US);
F25J1/0037 (EP,US);
F25J1/004 (EP,US);
F25J1/0042 (EP,US);
F25J1/0052 (EP,US);
F25J1/0202 (EP,US);
F25J1/0219 (EP,US);
F25J1/0254 (EP,US);
F25J1/0264 (EP,US);
F25J1/0282 (EP,US);
F25J1/0283 (EP,US);
F25J1/0288 (EP,US);
F25J3/0209 (EP,US);
F25J3/0233 (EP,US);
F25J2200/02 (EP,US);
F25J2200/70 (EP,US);
F25J2205/04 (EP,US);
F25J2210/06 (EP,US);
F25J2230/20 (EP,US);
F25J2240/02 (EP,US);
F25J2240/30 (EP,US);
F25J2240/40 (EP,US);
F25J2245/02 (EP,US);
F25J2270/06 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | ES, FR, GB, IT [1995/51] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR VERFLÜSSIGUNG VON ERDGAS | [1998/20] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR LIQUEFYING NATURAL GAS | [1995/51] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL DE LIQUEFACTION D'UN GAZ NATUREL | [1995/51] |
Former [1995/51] | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR VERFLÜSSIGUNG VON EINEM ERDGAS | Entry into regional phase | 02.10.1995 | National basic fee paid | 02.10.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.01.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.01.1996 | Examination requested [1996/10] | 29.07.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.01.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.02.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.08.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.11.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.03.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.04.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.05.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.08.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 25.08.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
10.08.1999
ADMISSIBLE LINDE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Abraham-Lincoln-Strasse 21 D-65189 Wiesbaden / DE Opponent's representative Zahn, Christoph Linde GmbH Intellectual Property EMEA Dr.-Carl-von-Linde-Straße 6-14 82049 Pullach / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/40] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
10.08.1999
ADMISSIBLE LINDE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Abraham-Lincoln-Strasse 21 D-65189 Wiesbaden / DE Opponent's representative Zahn, Christoph LINDE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT, Zentrale Patentabteilung 82049 Höllriegelskreuth / DE | 14.09.1999 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 09.03.2000 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 08.08.2000 | Date of oral proceedings | 30.08.2000 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 20.05.2003 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2003/40] | 20.05.2003 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | Appeal following opposition | 26.10.2000 | Appeal received No. T1089/00 | 22.12.2000 | Statement of grounds filed | 20.05.2003 | Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in unamended form | 20.05.2003 | Date of oral proceedings | 28.05.2003 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]US3616652 (ENGEL MANFRED O) [X] 1,23 * column W * [A] 2-13,19-22; | [A]FR2317609 (LUMMUS CO [US]) [A] 1-3,5-11,15,19,23 * the whole document *; | [A]US4778497 (HANSON THOMAS C [US], et al) [A] 1-24 * column W *; | [A]US3919852 (JONES JAMES KEVIN) [A] 1-24 * column W *; | [A]EP0266984 (BOC GROUP INC [US]) [A] 1,3-11,19,22,23 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0367156 (AIR PROD & CHEM [US]) [A] 1-24 * the whole document *; | [DA]US3735600 (DOWDELL S, et al) [DA] 1-24 * column W *; | [A]JPH04214970 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19921203), vol. 16, no. 561, Database accession no. (M - 1341), & JP04214970 A 19920805 (IWATA AIR COMPRESSOR MFG. CO. LTD.) [A] 17,18,24 * abstract * | [PX] - J.K.LILLARD & G.NICOL, "St. Fergus terminal gets turboexpanders for critical service", OIL AND GAS JOURNAL, TULSA US, (199409), vol. 92, no. 36, pages 92 - 100 [PX] 1 * the whole document * | [ ] - J.K.LILLARD & G. NICOL, Proceedings of the Seventy-Second GPA Annual Convention, (1994) [ ] * page 270 - page 277 * | [ ] - J.K.LILLARD & G. NICOL, "An operating history of turboexpanders in the supercritical fluid regime", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19950109), vol. 122, no. 2, Database accession no. 13301 [ ] * abstract * |