EP0737248 - CONTROL OF THE EXPRESSION OF THE IGF-I GENE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1996/42] | GENE EXPRESSION CONTROL | ||
[2007/22] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.09.2008 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.10.2008 [2008/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CENTRE NATIONAL DE LA RECHERCHE SCIENTIFIQUE -CNRS- 3, rue Michel-Ange 75016 Paris / FR | For all designated states INSTITUT NATIONAL DE LA SANTE ET DE LA RECHERCHE MEDICALE (INSERM) 101, rue de Tolbiac 75654 Paris Cédex 13 / FR | For all designated states MUSEUM NATIONAL D'HISTOIRE NATURELLE 57, rue Cuvier 75005 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2007/46] | For all designated states CENTRE NATIONAL DE LA RECHERCHE SCIENTIFIQUE (CNRS) 3, rue Michel Ange 75016 Paris / FR | ||
For all designated states INSTITUT NATIONAL DE LA SANTE ET DE LA RECHERCHE MEDICALE (INSERM) 101, rue de Tolbiac 75654 Paris Cédex 13 / FR | |||
For all designated states MUSEUM NATIONAL D'HISTOIRE NATURELLE 57, rue Cuvier 75005 Paris / FR | |||
Former [1996/42] | For all designated states CENTRE NATIONAL DE LA RECHERCHE SCIENTIFIQUE (CNRS) 3, rue Michel Ange 75016 Paris / FR | ||
For all designated states INSTITUT NATIONAL DE LA SANTE ET DE LA RECHERCHE MEDICALE (INSERM) 101, rue de Tolbiac 75654 Paris Cédex 13 / FR | |||
For all designated states MUSEUM NATIONAL D'HISTOIRE NATURELLE 57, rue Cuvier F-75005 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GIOVANNANGELI, Carine 16, rue Larrey F-75005 Paris / FR | 02 /
HELENE, Claude 14, quai d'Orléans F-75004 Paris / FR | [1996/42] | Representative(s) | Dernoncour, Roxane, et al Aventis Pharma S.A. Direction des Brevets Tri LEO/144 20, avenue Raymond Aron 92165 Antony Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2007/52] | Dernoncour, Roxane, et al Aventis Pharma S.A. Direction des Brevets, Tri LEO/144 20, avenue Raymond Aron 92165 Antony Cedex / FR | ||
Former [1996/42] | Savina, Jacques, et al RHONE-POULENC RORER S.A., Direction des Brevets, 20 avenue Raymond Aron 92160 Antony Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 95905172.3 | 27.12.1994 | [1996/42] | WO1994FR01536 | Priority number, date | FR19930015798 | 29.12.1993 Original published format: FR 9315798 | [1996/42] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9518223 | Date: | 06.07.1995 | Language: | FR | [1995/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0737248 | Date: | 16.10.1996 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.07.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0737248 | Date: | 14.11.2007 | Language: | FR | [2007/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.07.1995 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/11, C12N15/86, C07H21/02, A61K31/70 | [1996/42] | CPC: |
C12N15/113 (EP,US);
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61P31/22 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
C12N15/1132 (EP,US);
C12N15/1136 (EP,US);
A61K38/00 (EP,US);
C12N2310/152 (EP,US);
C12N2310/53 (EP,US);
C12N2310/531 (EP,US);
C12N2310/532 (EP,US);
Y10S977/802 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1996/42] | Title | German: | KONTROLLE DER EXPRIMIERUNG DES IGF-I GENS | [2007/22] | English: | CONTROL OF THE EXPRESSION OF THE IGF-I GENE | [2007/22] | French: | CONTROLE DE L'EXPRESSION DU GENE DE L'IGF-I | [2007/22] |
Former [1996/42] | KONTROLLE DER GEN- EXPRIMIERUNG | ||
Former [1996/42] | GENE EXPRESSION CONTROL | ||
Former [1996/42] | CONTROLE DE L'EXPRESSION DE GENES | Entry into regional phase | 20.06.1996 | National basic fee paid | 20.06.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.06.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.06.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 20.06.1996 | Examination requested [1996/43] | 04.05.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.11.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.02.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.07.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 30.09.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.01.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.07.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.04.2007 | Date of oral proceedings | 11.05.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.05.2007 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 21.09.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 21.09.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP07007057.8 / EP1939290 | Opposition(s) | 15.08.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/43] | Request for further processing for: | 30.09.2005 | Request for further processing filed | 30.09.2005 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 14.10.2005 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 15.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 01.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 03.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 02.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 13.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2002 | 09   M06   Fee paid on   15.02.2003 | 31.12.2003 | 10   M06   Fee paid on   01.03.2004 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO9106626 (GILEAD SCIENCES INC [US]) [Y] 1,2,6,24 * page 4, line 31 - page 5, line 35 * * example 8 * * claim - *; | [Y]WO9219732 (GENSET SA [FR]) [Y] 1,2,5,20,23 * page 17, line 11 - page 18, line 4 * * page 24, line 35 - page 25, line 33 * * page 33 * * figures 1,5 * * claim - *; | [A]WO9312230 (STANFORD RES INST INT [US]) [A] 1 * page 8, line 25 - line 31 * * page 28, line 34 - page 33, line 32 ** figures 12B,13; claims 19-23 *; | [DY]FR2687411 (NICE SOPHIA ANTIPOLIS UNIVERSI [FR]) [DY] 1-12,14-25 * the whole document * | [Y] - GIOVANNANGELI, C. ET AL., "Oligonucleotide clamps arrest DNA synthesis on a single - stranded DNA target.", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA 90 (21). 1993. 10013-10017 [Y] 1-4,7-12,14-19,21,22,25 * the whole document * | [DA] - GIOVANNANGELI, C. ET AL., "SINGLE - STRANDED DNA AS A TARGET FOR TRIPLE - HELIX FORMATION.", J AM CHEM SOC 113 (20). 1991. 7775-7777 [DA] 1-4,21,22 * the whole document * | [T] - HELENE, C., "Rational design of sequence-specific DNA ligands for artificial control of gene expression", PURE & APPLIED CHEMISTRY, vol. 66, no. 4, pages 663 - 669 [T] 1-4 * page 667, paragraph 3 * * figure 4 * | [T] - KANDIMALLA, E. & AGRAWAL, S., "Single-stranded-targeted triplex formation: stability, specificity and RNase H activation properties", GENE, AMSTERDAM NL, (19941104), vol. 149, pages 115 - 121 [T] 1-4 * figure 1 * | Examination | - ROBERTS R.; CROTHERS D., "Stability and properties of double and triple helices: dramatic effects of RNA or DNA backbone composition", SCIENCE, (19921127), vol. 258, pages 1463 - 1466, XP002026847 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1279808 | - MILLIGAN J. ET AL, "Oligoribonucleotide synthesis using T7 RNA polymerase and synthetic DNA duplexes", NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, (1987), vol. 15, pages 8783 - 8798, XP002360370 | - LANDRETH K. ET AL, "Insulin-like growth factor-I regulates pro-B cell differentiation", BLOOD, (19920901), vol. 80, pages 1207 - 1212 | - MOATS-STAATS B. ET AL, "Insulin-like growth factor-I (IGF-I) antisense oligodeoxynucleotide mediated inhibition of DNA synthesis by WI-38 cells: evidence for autocrine actions of IGF-I", MOLECULAR ENDOCRINOLOGY, (1993), vol. 7, pages 171 - 180 |