EP0738111 - PRODUCT AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING AN IMPROVED SUCROSE-FREE MILK CHOCOLATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.06.2001 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.06.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.07.2001 [2001/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kraft Jacobs Suchard AG Klausstrasse 4-6, P.O. Box 147 8034 Zürich / CH | [1999/52] |
Former [1996/43] | For all designated states Kraft Jacobs Suchard SA Klausstrasse 4-6 CH-8034 Zürich / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DESPLAND, Claude, André 14, rue des Troncs CH-2003 Neuchâtel / CH | 02 /
GNAGI, Christophe CH-2063 Vilars x / CH | 03 /
POSAVINI, Giacomo 20, rue Martenet CH-2003 Neuchâtel / CH | [1996/43] | Representative(s) | Eyles, Christopher Thomas W.P. Thompson & Co. 55 Drury Lane London WC2B 5SQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/43] | Eyles, Christopher Thomas W.P. THOMPSON & CO. Celcon House 289-293 High Holborn London WC1V 7HU / GB | Application number, filing date | 95905180.6 | 09.01.1995 | [1996/43] | WO1995GB00029 | Priority number, date | US19940179862 | 11.01.1994 Original published format: US 179862 | [1996/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9518541 | Date: | 13.07.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0738111 | Date: | 23.10.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.07.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0738111 | Date: | 09.08.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.07.1995 | Classification | IPC: | A23G1/00 | [1996/43] | CPC: |
A23G1/46 (EP,US);
A23G1/40 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1996/43] | Title | German: | PRODUKT UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON SUKROSEFREIEN MILCHSCHOKOLADEN | [2000/32] | English: | PRODUCT AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING AN IMPROVED SUCROSE-FREE MILK CHOCOLATE | [1996/43] | French: | PRODUIT ET PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION D'UN CHOCOLAT AU LAIT AMELIORE SANS SACCHAROSE | [1996/43] |
Former [1996/43] | Produkt und Verfahren zur Herstellung von sukrosefreien Milchschokoladen | Entry into regional phase | 21.06.1996 | National basic fee paid | 21.06.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.06.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.08.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 21.06.1996 | Examination requested [1996/43] | 10.03.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.06.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.09.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 09.10.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 27.10.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.01.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 20.01.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.05.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US1836303 (PHILIPP BORN) [A] 1 * examples 1,3; claim - *; | [A]FR2240693 (CADBURY LTD [GB]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2240694 (CADBURY LTD [GB]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0223872 (NESTLE SA [CH]) [A] 1* examples 1,11; claim - *; | [A]DE3735087 (BUEHLER AG GEB [CH]) [A] 1 * figure .; example . *; | [A]EP0317917 (SUEDDEUTSCHE ZUCKER AG [DE]) [A] 1,6 * page 3, lines 23-54; example -; claims 1-6,8 *; | [A]CH677429 (CHOCOLAT STELLA S A) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0512910 (ROQUETTE FRERES [FR]) [A] 1,5,7,8 * page 7, column 17 - page 8, column 8; examples 1,3; claims 1,6 *; | [A]WO9219112 (JACOBS SUCHARD AG [CH]) [A] 1,6-8 * example 1; claims 1-5,11-16 * |