EP0732001 - STATOR LEAD WIRE CONNECTION METHOD AND APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 25.02.2000 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.02.2000 | Refusal of application | published on 12.04.2000 [2000/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GLOBE PRODUCTS INC. 5051 Kitridge Road Huber Heights Ohio 45424 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1996/38] | For all designated states GLOBE PRODUCTS INC. 5051 Kitridge Road Huber Heights, Ohio 45424 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NEWMAN, Lawrence, E. 5325 David Drive Tipp City, OH 45371 / US | [1996/38] | Representative(s) | Lerwill, John, et al A.A. Thornton & Co. 10 Old Bailey London EC4M 7NG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/38] | Lerwill, John, et al A.A. Thornton & Co. Northumberland House 303-306 High Holborn London, WC1V 7LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 95905300.0 | 30.11.1994 | [1996/38] | WO1994US13646 | Priority number, date | US19930162414 | 03.12.1993 Original published format: US 162414 | [1996/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9515607 | Date: | 08.06.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0732001 | Date: | 18.09.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.06.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 08.06.1995 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.01.1998 | Classification | IPC: | H02K15/00 | [1996/38] | CPC: |
H02K15/0056 (EP,US);
H02K15/0068 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49009 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49011 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49012 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1996/38] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR KONTAKTIERUNG DES AUSSCHLUSSDRAHTES EINES STATORS | [1996/38] | English: | STATOR LEAD WIRE CONNECTION METHOD AND APPARATUS | [1996/38] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL DE CONNEXION DE FIL CONDUCTEUR DE STATOR | [1996/38] | Entry into regional phase | 03.06.1996 | National basic fee paid | 03.06.1996 | Search fee paid | 03.06.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.06.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.06.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 01.06.1996 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.06.1996 | Examination requested [1996/38] | 24.06.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.12.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.06.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 17.11.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [2000/15] | 29.11.1999 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2000/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.1999 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4322647 (NERODA THOMAS H, et al) [A] 1-11 * column 3, line 16 - line 28 *; | [A]EP0411275 (AXIS SPA [IT]) [A] 1-24 * column 9, line 11 - line 36 * | International search | [X]US5214838 (BEAKES JOHN M [US], et al); | [XP]US5361487 (LUCIANI SABATINO [IT], et al); | [A]US4951379 (CLEMENZ GARY E [US]) |