EP0740876 - NETWORK ELEMENT IN A MOBILE COMMUNICATION SYSTEM AND A METHOD FOR PACKET DATA TRANSMISSION IN A MOBILE COMMUNICATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.11.2004 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT, PT | published on 06.02.2008 [2008/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Corporation Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | [2002/11] |
Former [1999/52] | For all designated states Nokia Networks Oy Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | ||
For all designated states NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD. Nakolankatu 8 SF-24100 Salo / FI | |||
Former [1997/46] | For all designated states NOKIA TELECOMMUNICATIONS OY Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | ||
For all designated states NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD. Nakolankatu 8 SF-24100 Salo / FI | |||
Former [1996/45] | For all designated states NOKIA TELECOMMUNICATIONS OY Mäkkylän Puistotie 1 02600 Espoo / FI | ||
For all designated states NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD. Nakolankatu 8 SF-24100 Salo / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HÄMÄLÄINEN, Jari Matti Tapion katu 1 F 17 FIN-33720 Tampere / FI | 02 /
RAJALA, Jussi Huhtakoukku 31 C FIN-02340 Espoo / FI | 03 /
KESKINEN, Matti Virtakatu 4-6 B 6 FIN-04400 Järvenpää / FI | [1996/45] | Representative(s) | Äkräs, Tapio Juhani, et al Kolster Oy Ab Iso Roobertinkatu 23 P.O. Box 148 00121 Helsinki / FI | [N/P] |
Former [1996/45] | Äkräs, Tapio Juhani, et al Oy Kolster Ab, Iso Roobertinkatu 23, P.O. Box 148 00121 Helsinki / FI | Application number, filing date | 95905665.6 | 20.01.1995 | [1996/45] | WO1995FI00024 | Priority number, date | FI19940000314 | 21.01.1994 Original published format: FI 940314 | [1996/45] | Filing language | FI | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9520283 | Date: | 27.07.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0740876 | Date: | 06.11.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.07.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0740876 | Date: | 07.01.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 27.07.1995 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/56, H04Q7/22 | [1996/45] | CPC: |
H04Q11/0478 (EP,US);
H04L2012/5607 (EP,US);
H04L2012/5619 (EP,US);
H04L2012/563 (EP,US);
H04W88/14 (EP,US);
H04W88/16 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1996/45] | Title | German: | NETZWERKELEMENT IN EINEM MOBILEN KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR PAKETDATENÜBERTRAGUNG IN EINEM MOBILEN KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM | [1996/45] | English: | NETWORK ELEMENT IN A MOBILE COMMUNICATION SYSTEM AND A METHOD FOR PACKET DATA TRANSMISSION IN A MOBILE COMMUNICATION SYSTEM | [1996/45] | French: | ELEMENT DE RESEAU DANS UN SYSTEME DE TELECOMMUNICATIONS MOBILE ET PROCEDE DE TRANSMISSION DE DONNEES PAR PAQUETS DANS UN SYSTEME DE TELECOMMUNICATIONS MOBILE | [1996/45] | Entry into regional phase | 27.07.1995 | Translation filed | 28.06.1996 | National basic fee paid | 28.06.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.06.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.08.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 28.06.1996 | Examination requested [1996/45] | 23.05.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.11.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.01.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.07.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.07.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.10.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 31.10.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.10.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/53] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 07.01.2004 | BE | 07.01.2004 | CH | 07.01.2004 | FR | 07.01.2004 | IT | 07.01.2004 | LI | 07.01.2004 | NL | 07.01.2004 | IE | 20.01.2004 | LU | 20.01.2004 | MC | 31.01.2004 | DK | 07.04.2004 | GB | 07.04.2004 | GR | 07.04.2004 | SE | 07.04.2004 | ES | 18.04.2004 | PT | 07.06.2004 | [2008/06] |
Former [2006/14] | AT | 07.01.2004 | |
BE | 07.01.2004 | ||
CH | 07.01.2004 | ||
FR | 07.01.2004 | ||
LI | 07.01.2004 | ||
NL | 07.01.2004 | ||
IE | 20.01.2004 | ||
LU | 20.01.2004 | ||
MC | 31.01.2004 | ||
DK | 07.04.2004 | ||
GB | 07.04.2004 | ||
GR | 07.04.2004 | ||
SE | 07.04.2004 | ||
ES | 18.04.2004 | ||
Former [2006/12] | AT | 07.01.2004 | |
BE | 07.01.2004 | ||
CH | 07.01.2004 | ||
LI | 07.01.2004 | ||
NL | 07.01.2004 | ||
IE | 20.01.2004 | ||
LU | 20.01.2004 | ||
MC | 31.01.2004 | ||
DK | 07.04.2004 | ||
GB | 07.04.2004 | ||
GR | 07.04.2004 | ||
SE | 07.04.2004 | ||
ES | 18.04.2004 | ||
Former [2005/45] | AT | 07.01.2004 | |
BE | 07.01.2004 | ||
CH | 07.01.2004 | ||
LI | 07.01.2004 | ||
IE | 20.01.2004 | ||
LU | 20.01.2004 | ||
MC | 31.01.2004 | ||
DK | 07.04.2004 | ||
GB | 07.04.2004 | ||
GR | 07.04.2004 | ||
SE | 07.04.2004 | ||
ES | 18.04.2004 | ||
Former [2005/23] | AT | 07.01.2004 | |
BE | 07.01.2004 | ||
CH | 07.01.2004 | ||
LI | 07.01.2004 | ||
IE | 20.01.2004 | ||
LU | 20.01.2004 | ||
MC | 31.01.2004 | ||
DK | 07.04.2004 | ||
GR | 07.04.2004 | ||
SE | 07.04.2004 | ||
ES | 18.04.2004 | ||
Former [2005/03] | AT | 07.01.2004 | |
BE | 07.01.2004 | ||
CH | 07.01.2004 | ||
LI | 07.01.2004 | ||
IE | 20.01.2004 | ||
MC | 31.01.2004 | ||
DK | 07.04.2004 | ||
GR | 07.04.2004 | ||
SE | 07.04.2004 | ||
ES | 18.04.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | AT | 07.01.2004 | |
BE | 07.01.2004 | ||
CH | 07.01.2004 | ||
LI | 07.01.2004 | ||
MC | 31.01.2004 | ||
DK | 07.04.2004 | ||
GR | 07.04.2004 | ||
SE | 07.04.2004 | ||
ES | 18.04.2004 | ||
Former [2005/01] | AT | 07.01.2004 | |
BE | 07.01.2004 | ||
CH | 07.01.2004 | ||
LI | 07.01.2004 | ||
GR | 07.04.2004 | ||
SE | 07.04.2004 | ||
ES | 18.04.2004 | ||
Former [2004/46] | AT | 07.01.2004 | |
CH | 07.01.2004 | ||
LI | 07.01.2004 | ||
GR | 07.04.2004 | ||
SE | 07.04.2004 | ||
ES | 18.04.2004 | ||
Former [2004/44] | AT | 07.01.2004 | |
CH | 07.01.2004 | ||
LI | 07.01.2004 | ||
GR | 07.04.2004 | ||
SE | 07.04.2004 | ||
Former [2004/43] | AT | 07.01.2004 | |
GR | 07.04.2004 | ||
SE | 07.04.2004 | ||
Former [2004/41] | GR | 07.04.2004 | |
SE | 07.04.2004 | ||
Former [2004/40] | SE | 07.04.2004 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5168498 (ADAMS JOHN L [GB], et al); | [X]EP0522773 (AMERICAN TELEPHONE & TELEGRAPH [US]) | [A] - TDOC SMGL, 238/93, J. HAEMAELAEINEN et al.: "Packet Data over GSM Network", 28-09-1993, p. 1-8. |