EP0690978 - AN APPARATUS FOR TESTING THE PASSIVE FIT OF SCREW RETAINED STRUCTURES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.07.2001 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 01.10.2008 [2008/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DAWOOD, Andrew, Joseph, Stanley 3 Harcourt House, 19A Cavendish Square London W1M 9AD / GB | [1996/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1996/02] | Representative(s) | Olsson, Gunnar Nobel Biocare AB (publ) Box 5190 402 26 Göteborg / SE | [2008/40] |
Former [1996/02] | Olsson, Gunnar Nobelpharma AB Box 5190 S-402 26 Göteborg / SE | Application number, filing date | 95905732.4 | 25.01.1995 | [1996/02] | WO1995IB00055 | Priority number, date | GB19940001332 | 25.01.1994 Original published format: GB 9401332 | [1996/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9520146 | Date: | 27.07.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0690978 | Date: | 10.01.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.07.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0690978 | Date: | 20.09.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.07.1995 | Classification | IPC: | G01L5/24 | [1996/02] | CPC: |
G01L5/24 (EP,US);
A61C19/04 (EP,US);
A61C8/0089 (EP,US);
A61C1/186 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1996/02] | Title | German: | GERÄT ZUM TESTEN DER PASSIVEN VERBINDUNG VON MITEINANDER VERSCHRAUBTEN TEILEN | [1996/02] | English: | AN APPARATUS FOR TESTING THE PASSIVE FIT OF SCREW RETAINED STRUCTURES | [1996/02] | French: | APPAREIL D'ESSAI DE L'AJUSTEMENT PASSIF DE STRUCTURES RETENUES PAR VIS | [1996/02] | Entry into regional phase | 25.10.1995 | National basic fee paid | 25.10.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.01.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.01.1996 | Examination requested [1996/12] | 31.07.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.03.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 06.05.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.10.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.04.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.06.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.10.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.01.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.03.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.06.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 07.06.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.06.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/36] | Request for further processing for: | 06.05.1998 | Request for further processing filed | 06.05.1998 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 26.05.1998 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.01.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GR | 20.09.2000 | DK | 20.12.2000 | PT | 20.12.2000 | IE | 25.01.2001 | LU | 25.01.2001 | [2004/39] |
Former [2004/07] | GR | 20.09.2000 | |
DK | 20.12.2000 | ||
PT | 20.12.2000 | ||
IE | 25.01.2001 | ||
Former [2003/45] | DK | 20.12.2000 | |
PT | 20.12.2000 | ||
IE | 25.01.2001 | ||
Former [2002/14] | PT | 20.12.2000 | |
IE | 25.01.2001 | ||
Former [2001/18] | PT | 20.12.2000 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US3892146 (YASOSHIMA HIROSHI) [Y] 4; | [Y]US3974685 (WALKER RICHARD A) [Y] 7,8; | [XY]US4280380 (ESHGHY SIAVASH) [X] 1-3 [Y] 4-11; | [XY]US4359906 (CORDEY JACQUE R) [X] 1-3 [Y] 4-11; | [Y]US4759225 (REYNERTSON JOHN L [US], et al)[Y] 9; | [Y]US4887499 (KIPFELSBERGER ALBERT [DE]) [Y] 6; | [XY]US4926700 (PEPLINSKI ALPHONSO [US]) [X] 1-3 [Y] 4-11; | [X]US5158458 (PERRY WILLIAM L [US]) [X] 1,5 |