EP0737266 - CYLINDER LOCK AND KEY COMBINATION WITH A GUIDING PROFILE RIDGE IN THE LOCK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.01.2000 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.01.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.03.2000 [2000/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WINLOC AG c/o Hans Stuber, Baarerstrasse 75 6302 Zug / CH | [1999/11] |
Former [1996/42] | For all designated states WINLOC AG c/o Hans Stuber, Baarerstrasse 75 CH-6302 Zug / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WIDEN, Bo P.O. Box 37 644 00 Torshälla / SE | [1996/42] | Representative(s) | Modin, Jan, et al Ehrner & Delmar Patentbyra AB Box 10316 100 55 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/42] | Modin, Jan, et al c/o Axel Ehrners Patentbyra AB Box 10316 100 55 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 95905825.6 | 21.12.1994 | [1996/42] | WO1994SE01235 | Priority number, date | SE19930004355 | 30.12.1993 Original published format: SE 9304355 | [1996/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9518282 | Date: | 06.07.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0737266 | Date: | 16.10.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.07.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0737266 | Date: | 17.03.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 06.07.1995 | Classification | IPC: | E05B27/00, E05B27/10, E05B19/06 | [1996/42] | CPC: |
E05B27/0078 (EP,US);
E05B19/0017 (EP,US);
Y10T70/7605 (EP,US);
Y10T70/7864 (EP,US);
Y10T70/7881 (EP,US);
Y10T70/7932 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1996/42] | Extension states | LT | 17.06.1996 | Title | German: | ZYLINDERSCHLOSS UND SCHLÜSSEL MIT EINER FÜHRUNGSKANTE IM SCHLOSS | [1996/42] | English: | CYLINDER LOCK AND KEY COMBINATION WITH A GUIDING PROFILE RIDGE IN THE LOCK | [1996/42] | French: | ENSEMBLE SERRURE A BARILLET ET CLE A NERVURE DE GUIDAGE PROFILEE DANS LA SERRURE | [1996/42] | Entry into regional phase | 17.06.1996 | National basic fee paid | 17.06.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.06.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.07.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed | 17.06.1996 | Examination requested [1996/42] | 28.04.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.09.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.12.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 04.12.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.12.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]DE2931653 ; | [Y]FR2565281 (ITALIANA SERRATURE COSTR [IT]); | [Y]DE3314417 ; | [Y]DE3136314 ; | [Y]DE3024928 ; | [X]WO8704749 (WIDEN INNOVATION AB [SE]); | [XY]DE3603687 ; | [Y]WO9312314 (ASSA AB [SE]); | [AP]WO9401643 (WIDEN BO [SE]); | [XP]WO9428273 (VACHETTE SA [FR]) |