blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0737245

EP0737245 - STABLE HYGROSCOPIC DETERGENT ARTICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  22.12.2000
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip26.12.2003Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): GR
published on 11.02.2004  [2004/07]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ECOLAB INC.
Ecolab Center 370 North Wabasha Street
St. Paul, MN 55102-2233 / US
[N/P]
Former [1996/42]For all designated states
ECOLAB INC.
Ecolab Center
St. Paul Minnesota 55102 / US
Inventor(s)01 / HEILE, Bernard, Joseph
6063 Lower 134th Street West
Apple Valley, MN 55124 / US
02 / TARARA, James, John
8976 St. Croix Road
Woodbury, MN 55125 / US
[1996/42]
Representative(s)Belcher, Simon James
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP
Arena Point
Merrion Way
Leeds LS2 8PA / GB
[N/P]
Former [1996/42]Belcher, Simon James
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord Tower House Merrion Way
Leeds LS2 8PA / GB
Application number, filing date95906081.520.12.1994
[1996/42]
WO1994US14807
Priority number, dateUS1993017562730.12.1993         Original published format: US 175627
[1996/42]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9518215
Date:06.07.1995
Language:EN
[1995/29]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0737245
Date:16.10.1996
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.07.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[1996/42]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0737245
Date:23.02.2000
Language:EN
[2000/08]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP06.07.1995
ClassificationIPC:C11D17/00, C11D17/04, C11D7/06, C11D7/12, C11D7/14
[1996/42]
CPC:
C11D17/0052 (EP,US); C11D1/521 (EP,US); C11D17/0039 (EP,US);
C11D17/0082 (EP,US); C11D17/041 (EP,US); C11D3/044 (EP,US);
C11D3/08 (EP,US); C11D3/10 (EP,US); C11D7/06 (EP,US);
C11D7/12 (EP,US); C11D7/14 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1996/42]
TitleGerman:STABILER HYGROSKOPISCHER REINIGUNGSARTIKEL[1996/42]
English:STABLE HYGROSCOPIC DETERGENT ARTICLE[1996/42]
French:ARTICLE DETERGENT HYGROSCOPIQUE STABLE[1996/42]
Entry into regional phase25.06.1996National basic fee paid 
25.06.1996Designation fee(s) paid 
25.06.1996Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.07.1995Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
26.06.1996Examination requested  [1996/42]
03.07.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
07.01.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.05.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
18.06.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.09.1999Fee for grant paid
15.09.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)24.11.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/06]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.11.1996Renewal fee patent year 03
24.11.1997Renewal fee patent year 04
04.12.1998Renewal fee patent year 05
06.12.1999Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT23.02.2000
BE23.02.2000
CH23.02.2000
ES23.02.2000
GR23.02.2000
LI23.02.2000
NL23.02.2000
DK23.05.2000
PT23.05.2000
SE23.05.2000
[2004/07]
Former [2003/45]AT23.02.2000
BE23.02.2000
CH23.02.2000
ES23.02.2000
LI23.02.2000
NL23.02.2000
DK23.05.2000
PT23.05.2000
SE23.05.2000
Former [2003/08]AT23.02.2000
BE23.02.2000
CH23.02.2000
ES23.02.2000
LI23.02.2000
NL23.02.2000
PT23.05.2000
SE23.05.2000
Former [2002/26]AT23.02.2000
BE23.02.2000
CH23.02.2000
ES23.02.2000
LI23.02.2000
PT23.05.2000
SE23.05.2000
Former [2001/09]AT23.02.2000
BE23.02.2000
CH23.02.2000
LI23.02.2000
PT23.05.2000
SE23.05.2000
Former [2001/08]AT23.02.2000
BE23.02.2000
CH23.02.2000
LI23.02.2000
Former [2000/52]CH23.02.2000
LI23.02.2000
Cited inInternational search[A]GB989683  (COLGATE PALMOLIVE CO) [A] 1,4,30,32 * the whole document *;
 [DA]GB1031831  (COLGATE PALMOLIVE CO) [DA] 1,4,30,32 * the whole document *;
 [X]EP0002293  (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [X] 1,9 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0055100  (JEYES GROUP LTD [GB]) [A] 1,5,6 * page 6 - page 10 ** page 15 - page 16; claim - *;
 [DA]USRE32818E  (FERNHOLZ ET AL.) [DA] 1,3,12,17,20,26 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO9201037  (ECOLAB INC [US]) [A] 1,4,12,20 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO9301266  (WINBRO GROUP LTD [US]) [A] 1,12,17,26 * the whole document *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.