|
02.05.2002 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.03.2002 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.03.2002 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.02.2002 |
Filing of the translation of the amended claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.02.2002 |
Translation of the claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.02.2002 |
Translation of the claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.11.2001 |
Communication of bibliographic data |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.11.2001 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
29.11.2001 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.11.2001 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.08.2001 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.08.2001 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.08.2001 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.08.2001 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.08.2001 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
4 |
|
08.08.2001 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
08.08.2001 |
Description |
Opposition |
3 |
|
08.08.2001 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
6 |
|
08.08.2001 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
08.08.2001 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.08.2001 |
Text intended for grant |
Opposition |
11 |
|
08.06.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.05.2001 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.05.2001 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.02.2001 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
31.01.2001 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.01.2001 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.01.2001 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.01.2001 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.01.2001 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
24.01.2001 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.01.2001 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.01.2001 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.10.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.10.2000 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.09.2000 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.09.2000 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.08.2000 |
Indication of deficiencies in a request for registering a transfer of rights and invitation to correct them |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.08.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.08.2000 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
15.08.2000 |
Request for assignment |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.08.2000 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.06.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.04.2000 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.04.2000 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.01.2000 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.07.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.07.1999 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
3 |
|
28.06.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.06.1999 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.06.1999 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.02.1999 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.02.1999 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.10.1998 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.10.1998 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
13 |
|
19.02.1998 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.12.1997 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.12.1997 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
22.12.1997 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
25.09.1997 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
09.09.1997 |
Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.08.1997 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
06.08.1997 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
29.07.1997 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.01.1997 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
27.01.1997 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.01.1997 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.09.1996 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
19.07.1996 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
19.07.1996 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.07.1996 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
11.03.1996 |
Annexes to the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.03.1996 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
11.03.1996 |
Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.09.1995 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
14.08.1995 |
Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.08.1995 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
03.08.1995 |
International publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
26 |
|
03.08.1995 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
20.01.1995 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
20.01.1995 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
20.01.1995 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
20.01.1995 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
20.01.1995 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
20.01.1995 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
20.01.1995 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
30 |