EP0789843 - APPARATUS FOR PUMPING AND DIRECTING FLUIDS FOR HEMATOLOGY TESTING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.03.2008 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.06.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 06.07.2011 [2011/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CDC TECHNOLOGIES, INC. One Great Hill Road Oxford, CT 06478 / US | [1997/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CARVER, Edward, Lawrence, Jr. 18 Lisa Drive Oxford, CT 06478 / US | 02 /
DECAVA, David, Charles 35 Sioux Drive Oxford, CT 06478 / US | [1997/34] | Representative(s) | Gerbaulet, Hannes, et al RGTH Patentanwälte PartGmbB Neuer Wall 10 20354 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/34] | Gerbaulet, Hannes, et al Patentanwälte Richter, Werdermann & Gerbaulet Neuer Wall 10 20354 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 95906633.3 | 06.09.1994 | [1997/34] | WO1994US14372 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9607903 | Date: | 14.03.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0789843 | Date: | 20.08.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.03.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0789843 | Date: | 02.05.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 14.03.1996 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.11.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/49, G01N33/00, G01N15/14 | [2000/52] | CPC data not yet available |
Former IPC [1997/34] | G01N33/49, G01N33/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, IT [1997/34] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM PUMPEN UND FÜHREN VON FLÜSSIGKEITEN IM ZUSAMMENHANG MIT HÄMATOLOGISCHEN PRÜFUNGEN | [1997/34] | English: | APPARATUS FOR PUMPING AND DIRECTING FLUIDS FOR HEMATOLOGY TESTING | [1997/34] | French: | APPAREIL PERMETTANT DE POMPER ET DE DIRIGER DES FLUIDES EN VUE D'EFFECTUER UN TEST D'HEMATOLOGIE | [1997/34] | Entry into regional phase | 04.04.1997 | National basic fee paid | 10.06.1997 | Search fee paid | 04.04.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.04.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.04.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 04.04.1997 | Examination requested [1997/34] | 06.11.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 07.06.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.01.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.07.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.09.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 03.06.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.06.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.10.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.06.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.10.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 12.10.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.02.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 09.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 30.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 23.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 22.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 07.04.1997 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   04.06.1997 | 30.09.2001 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   27.02.2002 | 30.09.2006 | 13   M06   Fee paid on   22.03.2007 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DE | 03.08.2007 | ES | 13.08.2007 | IT | 30.09.2007 | FR | 28.12.2007 | [2011/27] |
Former [2008/24] | DE | 03.08.2007 | |
ES | 13.08.2007 | ||
FR | 28.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/06] | ES | 13.08.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4606631 (ANNO GOUSUKE ET AL) [A] 2 * column A; figure 4 *; | [A]US4428669 (BESSIS MARCEL) [A] 2 * column A; figures 1,3 * | International search | [Y]US4030888 (YAMAMOTO HIROSHI, et al); | [A]US4503385 (HAYNES JOHN L [US]); | [X]US4683212 (UFFENHEIMER KENNETH F [US]); | [X]US4695431 (FARRELL GREGORY A [US]); | [A]US4948565 (BEMIS WILLIAM G [US], et al); | [X]US5030002 (NORTH HOWARD L JR [US]); | [Y]US5316725 (CARVER JR EDWARD L [US], et al); | [XE]US5380491 (CARVER JR EDWARD L [US], et al) | [Y] - THE HENLEY GROUP INC, Published 1986, "The CELLECT Hematology Systems from Instrumentation Laboratory". | [Y] - FISHER SCIENTIFIC CATALOG, Published 1988, pages 1402-1403. | [A] - AMERICAN JOURNAL OF CLINICAL PATHOLOGY, Vol. 88, issued 1987, PAYNE et al., "Evaluation of the TOA e-5000 Automated Hematology Analyzer", pages 51-57. | [A] - AMERICAN JOURNAL OF CLINICAL PATHOLOGY, Vol. 96, isued 1991, HALLAWELL et al., "An Evaluation of the Sysmex NE-8000 Hematology Analyzer", pages 594-601. |