EP0696330 - PROCESS FOR PURIFYING AQUEOUS SOLUTIONS OF TERTIARY AMINO OXIDES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 31.08.2001 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.08.2004 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): LU | published on 22.09.2004 [2004/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LENZING AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werkstrasse 1 4860 Lenzing / AT | [1997/46] |
Former [1996/07] | For all designated states LENZING AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werkstrasse 1 A-4860 Lenzing / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MÜLLEDER, Eduard Wachtelweg 5 A-4030 Linz / AT | 02 /
FIRGO, Heinrich Oberstadtgries 7/4 A-4840 Vöcklabruck / AT | [1996/07] | Representative(s) | Schwarz, Albin Schwarz & Partner Patentanwälte Wipplingerstrasse 30 1010 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [1996/07] | Schwarz, Albin, Dr. Albertgasse 10/8 Postfach 224 A-1081 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 95906835.4 | 01.02.1995 | [1996/07] | WO1995AT00022 | Priority number, date | AT19940000430 | 01.03.1994 Original published format: AT 43094 | [1996/07] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9523885 | Date: | 08.09.1995 | [1995/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0696330 | Date: | 14.02.1996 | [1996/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0696330 | Date: | 12.11.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.09.1995 | Classification | IPC: | D01F13/02, D01F2/00, B01J39/22, B01J41/16, C08B1/00 | [1996/07] | CPC: |
C07C291/04 (EP,US);
C08B1/003 (EP,US);
C08J3/096 (EP,US);
C08L1/02 (EP,US);
D01F2/00 (EP,US);
C08J2301/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1996/07] | Extension states | LT | 27.09.1995 | SI | 27.09.1995 | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR REINIGUNG WÄSSRIGER LÖSUNGEN TERTIÄRER AMINOXIDE | [1996/07] | English: | PROCESS FOR PURIFYING AQUEOUS SOLUTIONS OF TERTIARY AMINO OXIDES | [1996/07] | French: | PROCEDE DE PURIFICATION DE SOLUTIONS AQUEUSES D'AMINO-OXYDES TERTIAIRES | [1996/07] | Entry into regional phase | 27.09.1995 | National basic fee paid | 27.09.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.09.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.09.1995 | Examination requested [1996/07] | 16.10.1995 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 07.02.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.02.1996 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 12.06.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.09.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.03.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.04.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.04.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.07.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 17.07.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
23.07.1998
10.08.1998
ADMISSIBLE Lurgi Zimmer AG/ALCERU Schwarza/Thür.Inst.f.Textil-u.Kunstst.forschung Borsigallee 1/Breitscheidstr.103/Breitscheidstr.97 60388 Frankfurt/07407 Rudolstadt/07407 Rudolstadt / DE Opponent's representative Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB, et al, et al Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/29] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
23.07.1998
10.08.1998
ADMISSIBLE Lurgi Zimmer AG/ALCERU Schwarza/Thür.Inst.f.Textil-u.Kunstst.forschung Borsigallee 1/Breitscheidstr.103/Breitscheidstr.97 60388 Frankfurt/07407 Rudolstadt/07407 Rudolstadt / DE Opponent's representative Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät, et al, et al Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [1999/23] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
23.07.1998
10.08.1998
ADMISSIBLE Lurgi Zimmer AG/ALCERU Schwarza/Thür.Inst.f.Textil-u.Kunstst.forschung Borsigallee 1/Breitscheidstr.103/Breitscheidstr.97 60388 Frankfurt/07407 Rudolstadt/07407 Rudolstadt / DE Opponent's representative Fechner, Joachim, Dr.-Ing. Im Broeltal 118 53773 Hennef / DE | ||
Former [1998/38] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
23.07.1998
Zimmer AG/ALCERU Schwarza/Thür.Inst.f.Textil-u.Kunstst.forschung Borsigallee 1/Breitscheidstr.103/Breitscheidstr.97 60388 Frankfurt/07407 Rudolstadt/07407 Rudolsta / DE Opponent's representative Fechner, Joachim Im Broeltal 118 53773 Hennef / DE | 15.09.1998 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 15.03.1999 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 27.03.2001 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2001/42] | 27.03.2001 | Date of oral proceedings | 21.05.2001 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 21.05.2001 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DK | 12.11.1997 | ES | 12.11.1997 | GR | 12.11.1997 | LU | 01.02.1998 | PT | 12.02.1998 | SE | 12.02.1998 | IE | 14.07.1998 | MC | 31.08.1998 | CH | 28.02.1999 | LI | 28.02.1999 | [2004/39] |
Former [2003/18] | DK | 12.11.1997 | |
ES | 12.11.1997 | ||
GR | 12.11.1997 | ||
PT | 12.02.1998 | ||
SE | 12.02.1998 | ||
LU | 28.02.1998 | ||
IE | 14.07.1998 | ||
MC | 31.08.1998 | ||
CH | 28.02.1999 | ||
LI | 28.02.1999 | ||
Former [2003/17] | DK | 12.11.1997 | |
ES | 12.11.1997 | ||
GR | 12.11.1997 | ||
PT | 12.02.1998 | ||
SE | 12.02.1998 | ||
LU | 28.02.1998 | ||
IE | 14.07.1998 | ||
MC | 01.09.1998 | ||
CH | 28.02.1999 | ||
LI | 28.02.1999 | ||
Former [2002/26] | DK | 12.11.1997 | |
ES | 12.11.1997 | ||
GR | 12.11.1997 | ||
PT | 12.02.1998 | ||
SE | 12.02.1998 | ||
LU | 28.02.1998 | ||
IE | 14.07.1998 | ||
MC | 31.08.1998 | ||
CH | 28.02.1999 | ||
LI | 28.02.1999 | ||
Former [2002/10] | DK | 12.11.1997 | |
GR | 12.11.1997 | ||
PT | 12.02.1998 | ||
SE | 12.02.1998 | ||
LU | 28.02.1998 | ||
IE | 14.07.1998 | ||
MC | 31.08.1998 | ||
CH | 28.02.1999 | ||
LI | 28.02.1999 | ||
Former [2000/52] | DK | 12.11.1997 | |
GR | 12.11.1997 | ||
IE | 12.11.1997 | ||
PT | 12.02.1998 | ||
SE | 12.02.1998 | ||
LU | 28.02.1998 | ||
MC | 31.08.1998 | ||
CH | 28.02.1999 | ||
LI | 28.02.1999 | ||
Former [2000/50] | DK | 12.11.1997 | |
GR | 12.11.1997 | ||
IE | 12.11.1997 | ||
PT | 12.02.1998 | ||
SE | 12.02.1998 | ||
LU | 28.02.1998 | ||
MC | 31.08.1998 | ||
CH | 18.09.1999 | ||
LI | 18.09.1999 | ||
Former [2000/05] | DK | 12.11.1997 | |
GR | 12.11.1997 | ||
IE | 12.11.1997 | ||
PT | 12.02.1998 | ||
SE | 12.02.1998 | ||
LU | 28.02.1998 | ||
MC | 31.08.1998 | ||
Former [1999/16] | DK | 12.11.1997 | |
IE | 12.11.1997 | ||
PT | 12.02.1998 | ||
SE | 12.02.1998 | ||
MC | 31.08.1998 | ||
Former [1998/51] | DK | 12.11.1997 | |
PT | 12.02.1998 | ||
SE | 12.02.1998 | ||
MC | 31.08.1998 | ||
Former [1998/37] | DK | 12.11.1997 | |
PT | 12.02.1998 | ||
SE | 12.02.1998 | ||
Former [1998/35] | DK | 12.11.1997 | |
SE | 12.02.1998 | ||
Former [1998/30] | DK | 12.11.1997 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO8909643 (GRANDICS PETER [US]) [A] 1,7* page 7; examples 2,3 *; | [DA]EP0427701 (CHEMIEFASER LENZING AG [AT]) [DA] 1 * abstract *; | [DA]WO9311287 (COURTAULDS PLC [GB]) [DA] 1 * abstract * |