EP0741812 - PROCESS TO IMPROVE RESISTANCE TO STAINS ON FIBRES AND DERIVED PRODUCTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.08.2000 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.08.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.09.2000 [2000/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states N.V. DENDERLAND-MARTIN Nijverheidslaan 2-4 B-9308 Aalst-Gijzegem / BE | [1996/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DE LATHAUWER, Armand S. Van der Guchtlaan 9 B-9300 Aalst / BE | [1996/46] | Representative(s) | Overath, Philippe Cabinet Bede Boulevard Général Wahis 15 1030 Bruxelles / BE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/46] | Overath, Philippe Cabinet Bede, Place de l'Alma, 3 1200 Bruxelles / BE | Application number, filing date | 95906852.9 | 25.01.1995 | [1996/46] | WO1995BE00006 | Priority number, date | BE19940000124 | 02.02.1994 Original published format: BE 9400124 | [1996/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9521955 | Date: | 17.08.1995 | [1995/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0741812 | Date: | 13.11.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.08.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0741812 | Date: | 13.10.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.11.1995 | Classification | IPC: | D06M15/00 | [1996/46] | CPC: |
D06P1/56 (EP,US);
D06M13/238 (EP,US);
D06M15/412 (EP,US);
D06P1/6533 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2915 (EP,US);
Y10T442/2279 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, DK, FR, GB, IT, NL [1996/46] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR VERBESSERUNG DER FLECKENBESTÄNDIGKEIT VON FASERN UND FASERPRODUKTEN | [1996/46] | English: | PROCESS TO IMPROVE RESISTANCE TO STAINS ON FIBRES AND DERIVED PRODUCTS | [1996/46] | French: | PROCEDE PERMETTANT D'AMELIORER LA RESISTANCE AUX TACHES DES FIBRES ET DE PRODUITS DERIVES | [1996/46] | Entry into regional phase | 02.09.1996 | National basic fee paid | 02.09.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.09.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.08.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 02.09.1996 | Examination requested [1996/46] | 03.11.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.12.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.03.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.04.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.07.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 26.07.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.07.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2342823 (PAUL SCHLACK) [A] 1 * column W *; | [A]FR864576 (GIORGIO CHIERA DI VASCO) [A] 1 * page 1, column R, line 39 - line 49 *; | [DA]US4501591 (UCCI POMPELIO A [US], et al) [DA] 1 * column W *; | [A]JPS61174485 | [A] - WADA, HIDEKI, "Prevention of staining of dyed silk yarns", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19790122), vol. 90, no. 4, Database accession no. 24736d, page 71, column 2 [A] 1 * abstract * * & JP-A-53 081 788 (KONISHI MEGUMI SHOTEN KK) * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 86, no. 38, Database accession no. 86-247834, & JPS61174485 A 19860806 (KANEBO KK) [A] 1 * abstract * | Examination | GB673634 |