EP0690762 - METHOD OF SOLDERING RIBS TO A HALF-SECTION PIPE AND A DEVICE FOR CARRYING OUT SAID METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 27.03.1997 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.03.1997 | Withdrawal of application | published on 14.05.1997 [1997/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GEA Aktiengesellschaft Dorstener Strasse 484 44809 Bochum / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/02] | For all designated states GEA Aktiengesellschaft Dorstener Strasse 484 D-44809 Bochum / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BORCHERT, Werner Delle 44 D-44468 Mülheim-Ruhr / DE | [1996/02] | Representative(s) | Bockermann, Rolf Bergstrasse 159 44791 Bochum / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/02] | Bockermann, Rolf, Dipl.-Ing. Bergstrasse 159 D-44791 Bochum / DE | Application number, filing date | 95906884.2 | 24.01.1995 | [1996/02] | WO1995DE00102 | Priority number, date | DE19944402221 | 26.01.1994 Original published format: DE 4402221 | DE19944429151 | 21.07.1994 Original published format: DE 4429151 | DE19944430416 | 26.08.1994 Original published format: DE 4430416 | [1996/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9520455 | Date: | 03.08.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0690762 | Date: | 10.01.1996 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.08.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.08.1995 | Classification | IPC: | B23K1/00, // B23K101:08, B23K101:14 | [1996/02] | CPC: |
B23K1/002 (EP);
B23K2101/08 (EP);
B23K2101/14 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1996/02] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM LÖTEN VON RIPPEN MIT EINER ROHRSCHALE UND ANORDNUNG ZUR DURCHFÜHRUNG DES VERFAHRENS | [1996/02] | English: | METHOD OF SOLDERING RIBS TO A HALF-SECTION PIPE AND A DEVICE FOR CARRYING OUT SAID METHOD | [1996/02] | French: | PROCEDE PERMETTANT DE BRASER DES AILETTES SUR DES DEMI-TUBES ET SYSTEME DE MISE EN UVRE DUDIT PROCEDE | [1996/02] | Entry into regional phase | 05.09.1995 | National basic fee paid | 05.09.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.09.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.09.1995 | Examination requested [1996/02] | 16.09.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.03.1997 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1997/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]GB1312521 (CHAUSSON USINES SA)[A] 1-22; | [A]US5102032 (COTTONE ANDREW JOHN [US], et al) [A] 1-22; | [A]EP0490210 (GEA LUFTKUEHLER HAPPEL GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-22; | [A]WO9210329 (GEA LUFTKUEHLER HAPPEL GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-22 |