29.10.2004 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.12.2004 [2004/51] |
19.09.2003 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.11.2003 [2003/45] |
19.04.2002 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.06.2002 [2002/23] |
12.01.2001 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.02.2001 [2001/09] |
12.01.2001 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 28.02.2001 [2001/09] |
05.01.2001 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.02.2001 [2001/08] |
28.01.2000 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 15.03.2000 [2000/11] |
17.01.2000 |
Renewal fee |
|
27.10.1999 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
16.08.1999 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
16.08.1999 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
30.03.1999 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
05.03.1999 |
Change - German title |
published on 21.04.1999 [1999/16] |
18.01.1999 |
Renewal fee |
|
14.08.1998 |
Change - applicant |
published on 30.09.1998 [1998/40] |
17.07.1998 |
Examination report or reply |
|
17.07.1998 |
Change - request for further processing |
|
09.07.1998 |
Change - request for further processing |
|
15.04.1998 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
|
16.01.1998 |
Examination report or reply |
|
15.01.1998 |
Renewal fee |
|
05.09.1997 |
First examination report |
|
04.09.1997 |
Examination report or reply |
|
12.08.1997 |
Period of grace (R.85a/R.108(3) EPC1973) |
|
25.07.1997 |
Change - designated states |
published on 10.09.1997 [1997/37] |
24.07.1997 |
Loss of particular rights |
|
03.04.1997 |
Loss of particular rights |
|
29.01.1997 |
Renewal fee |
|
17.01.1997 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 05.03.1997 [1997/10] |
17.01.1997 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 05.03.1997 [1997/10] |
11.01.1997 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
17.12.1996 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
05.12.1996 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
12.08.1996 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
29.02.1996 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
22.12.1995 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|