EP0759888 - Process for the preparation of layered double hydroxides. [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1997/10] | SYNTHETIC MEIXNERITE PRODUCT AND METHOD | ||
[1999/16] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.01.2001 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.10.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 15.12.2004 [2004/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALUMINUM COMPANY OF AMERICA Alcoa Technical Center, 100 Technical Drive Alcoa Center Pennsylvania 15069-0001 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1998/40] | For all designated states ALUMINUM COMPANY OF AMERICA Alcoa Technical Center, 100 Technical Drive Alcoa Center, Pennsylvania 15069-0001 / US | ||
Former [1997/10] | For all designated states ALUMINIUM COMPANY OF AMERICA Alcoa Technical Center, 100 Technical Drive Alcoa Center, PA 15069-0001 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MARTIN, Edward S., Alcoa Technical Center 100 Technical Drive Alcoa Center, PA 15069-0001 / US | 02 /
PEARSON, Alan Alcoa Technical Center 100 Technical Drive lcoa Center, PA 15069-0001 / US | [1997/10] | Representative(s) | Baillie, Iain Cameron Ladas & Parry, Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/10] | Baillie, Iain Cameron c/o Ladas & Parry Altheimer Eck 2 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95907324.8 | 06.01.1995 | [1997/10] | WO1995US00167 | Priority number, date | US19940235504 | 29.04.1994 Original published format: US 235504 | [1997/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9529874 | Date: | 09.11.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0759888 | Date: | 05.03.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.11.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0759888 | Date: | 15.03.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.11.1995 | Classification | IPC: | C01F7/00, C01B13/36 | [1997/10] | CPC: |
C07C51/412 (EP,US);
B01J23/007 (EP,US);
C01B13/363 (EP,US);
C01B19/002 (EP,US);
C01B33/38 (EP,US);
C01F7/00 (EP,US);
C01F7/784 (EP,US);
C01F7/785 (US);
C01G3/006 (EP,US);
C01G31/006 (EP,US);
C01G39/006 (EP,US);
C01G41/006 (EP,US);
C01G45/006 (EP,US);
C01G49/009 (EP,US);
C01G53/006 (EP,US);
C01G9/006 (EP,US);
C01P2002/22 (EP,US);
C01P2002/72 (EP,US);
C01P2004/61 (EP,US);
C01P2004/62 (EP,US);
C01P2006/12 (EP,US);
C01P2006/82 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C07C51/412, C07C53/126 (US,EP);
C07C51/412, C07C55/10 (US,EP);
C07C51/412, C07C63/08 (EP,US);
C07C51/412, C07C63/28 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, NL, PT, SE [1997/37] |
Former [1997/10] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von schichtförmigen Doppelhydroxiden. | [1999/16] | English: | Process for the preparation of layered double hydroxides. | [1999/16] | French: | Procédé pour production d'hydroxides doubles lamellaires. | [1999/16] |
Former [1997/10] | SYNTHETISCH HERGESTELLTES MEIXNERITPRODUKT UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON | ||
Former [1997/10] | SYNTHETIC MEIXNERITE PRODUCT AND METHOD | ||
Former [1997/10] | PRODUIT A BASE D'HYDRATE HYDROXYDE DE MAGNESIUM-ALUMINIUM SYNTHETIQUE ET PROCEDE ASSOCIE | Entry into regional phase | 25.11.1996 | National basic fee paid | 25.11.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.11.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.10.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 25.11.1996 | Examination requested [1997/10] | 30.11.1996 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 07.04.1997 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) CH, LI, LU, MC | 09.09.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.04.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 26.06.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.04.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.08.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.10.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 19.10.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.12.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/09] | Request for further processing for: | 26.06.1998 | Request for further processing filed | 26.06.1998 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 22.07.1998 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.01.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 28.01.1997 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 28.01.1997 | LI   M01   Not yet paid | 28.01.1997 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 28.01.1997 | MC   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 15.03.2000 | BE | 15.03.2000 | SE | 15.03.2000 | DK | 15.06.2000 | PT | 15.06.2000 | GR | 16.06.2000 | [2004/51] |
Former [2003/45] | AT | 15.03.2000 | |
BE | 15.03.2000 | ||
SE | 15.03.2000 | ||
DK | 15.06.2000 | ||
PT | 15.06.2000 | ||
Former [2002/23] | AT | 15.03.2000 | |
BE | 15.03.2000 | ||
SE | 15.03.2000 | ||
PT | 15.06.2000 | ||
Former [2001/09] | AT | 15.03.2000 | |
BE | 15.03.2000 | ||
PT | 15.06.2000 | ||
Former [2001/08] | AT | 15.03.2000 | |
BE | 15.03.2000 | Cited in | International search | [A]USRE34164E (MISRA) [A] 1-16* column W * | [X] - J.C.P.D.S-DATABASE, Record 38-478 ICDD, Newtown Square, Pa (USA) [X] 1-7 | [X] - S. KORITNIG ET AL., "Meixnerite, Mg6Al2(OH)18.4H2O, ein neues Magnesium-Aluminium-Hydroxid-Mineral.", TSCHERMAKS MIN. PETR. MITT., (1975), vol. 22, pages 79 - 87 [X] 1-7 * table 1 * | [DA] - E.D. DIMOTAKIS ET AL., "New route to Layered Double Hydroxides Intercalated by Organic Anions: Precursors to Polyoxometalate-Pillared Derivatives.", INORGANIC CHEMISTRY, (19900627), vol. 29, no. 13 [DA] 1-7 |