EP0745097 - PROCESS FOR PRODUCING EMULSION POLYMERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.11.1998 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.01.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): IE | published on 06.03.2002 [2002/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Henkel Kommanditgesellschaft auf Aktien 40191 Düsseldorf / DE | [1996/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FEUSTEL, Dieter Fichtestrasse 24 D-40789 Monheim / DE | 02 /
EICKEN, Ulrich Gilleshütte 39c D-41352 Korschenbroich / DE | 03 /
ENGELS, Thomas Freiheitsring 42 D-50226 Frechen / DE | [1996/49] | Application number, filing date | 95907657.1 | 09.02.1995 | [1996/49] | WO1995EP00461 | Priority number, date | DE19944405204 | 18.02.1994 Original published format: DE 4405204 | [1996/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9522564 | Date: | 24.08.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0745097 | Date: | 04.12.1996 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.08.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0745097 | Date: | 21.01.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.08.1995 | Classification | IPC: | C08F2/26, B01F17/34 | [1996/49] | CPC: |
C08G63/6886 (EP,US);
C08F2/26 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IE, IT, NL [1996/49] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON EMULSIONSPOLYMERISATEN | [1996/49] | English: | PROCESS FOR PRODUCING EMULSION POLYMERS | [1996/49] | French: | PROCEDE DE PREPARATION DE POLYMERES EN EMULSION | [1996/49] | Entry into regional phase | 09.08.1996 | National basic fee paid | 09.08.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.08.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.06.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 09.08.1996 | Examination requested [1996/49] | 18.02.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.03.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.04.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.07.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.10.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 13.10.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.10.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IE | 24.08.1998 | [2002/10] |
Former [1999/16] | IE | 21.01.1998 | Cited in | International search | [XD]US2454546 (BOCK LOUIS H, et al) [XD] 1,2,4; | [YD]US2489943 (WILSON THOMAS L, et al) [YD] 1,2,4-9; | [AD]GB1382314 (PETRO TEX CHEM CORP)[AD] 1-13; | [YD]DE2904395 (CIBA GEIGY AG) [YD] 1,2,4-9; | [A]EP0020906 (DIAMOND SHAMROCK CORP [US]) [A] 1-13 |