EP0743949 - PROCESS FOR PRODUCING ENDOTOXIN-FREE OR ENDOTOXIN-POOR NUCLEIC ACIDS AND/OR OLIGONUCLEOTIDES FOR GENE THERAPY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 15.12.2006 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.12.2006 | Opposition rejected | published on 17.01.2007 [2007/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QIAGEN GmbH Max-Volmer-Strasse 4 40724 Hilden / DE | [1996/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COLPAN, Metin Uhlandstrasse 5 D-45219 Essen / DE | 02 /
SCHORR, Joachim An der Schützenwiese 43 D-40231 Düsseldorf / DE | 03 /
MORITZ, Peter Platanenallee 7 D-50169 Kerpen / DE | [1996/48] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/48] | Meyers, Hans-Wilhelm, Dr.Dipl.-Chem., et al Patentanwälte von Kreisler-Selting-Werner Postfach 10 22 41 50462 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 95908258.7 | 03.02.1995 | [1996/48] | WO1995EP00389 | Priority number, date | DE19944403692 | 07.02.1994 Original published format: DE 4403692 | DE19944422291 | 25.06.1994 Original published format: DE 4422291 | DE19944431125 | 01.09.1994 Original published format: DE 4431125 | DE19944432654 | 14.09.1994 Original published format: DE 4432654 | [1996/48] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9521177 | Date: | 10.08.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0743949 | Date: | 27.11.1996 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.08.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0743949 | Date: | 15.12.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.08.1995 | Classification | IPC: | C07H1/08, C12N15/10, C12P19/34 | [1996/48] | CPC: |
B01D15/363 (EP,US);
A61P21/04 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
B01D15/3804 (EP,US);
C12N15/101 (EP,US);
C12N15/87 (EP,US);
Y10S435/81 (EP,US);
Y10S435/82 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
B01D15/3804, B01D15/363, G01N30/461 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, FR, GB, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1996/48] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG ENDOTOXINFREIER ODER AN ENDOTOXIN ABGEREICHERTER NUCLEINSÄUREN UND/ODER OLIGONUCLEOTIDE FÜR DIE GENTHERAPIE | [1996/48] | English: | PROCESS FOR PRODUCING ENDOTOXIN-FREE OR ENDOTOXIN-POOR NUCLEIC ACIDS AND/OR OLIGONUCLEOTIDES FOR GENE THERAPY | [1996/48] | French: | PROCEDE DE PREPARATION D'ACIDES NUCLEIQUES ET/OU D'OLIGONUCLEOTIDES SANS ENDOTOXINES OU PAUVRES EN ENDOTOXINES UTILES EN THERAPIE GENIQUE | [1996/48] | Entry into regional phase | 24.07.1996 | National basic fee paid | 24.07.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.07.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.08.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 24.07.1996 | Examination requested [1996/48] | 08.10.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.03.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.05.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.09.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 10.09.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.09.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
07.09.2000
28.09.2000
ADMISSIBLE Machery, Nagel GmbH & Co. KG Valencienner Strasse 11 52313 Düren / DE Opponent's representative Paul, Dieter-Alfred Paul & Albrecht Patentanwälte PartG mbB Stresemannallee 4b 41460 Neuss / DE | 02
15.09.2000
03.12.2002
WITHDRAWN Cobra Therapeutics Limited The Science Park University of Keele KEELE ST5 5SP Staffordshire / GB Opponent's representative HGF 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/04] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
07.09.2000
28.09.2000
ADMISSIBLE Machery, Nagel GmbH & Co. KG Valencienner Strasse 11 52313 Düren / DE Opponent's representative Paul, Dieter-Alfred, Dipl.-Ing. Paul & Albrecht, Patentanwaltssozietät, Hellersbergstrasse 18 41460 Neuss / DE | ||
02
15.09.2000
03.12.2002
WITHDRAWN Cobra Therapeutics Limited The Science Park University of Keele KEELE ST5 5SP Staffordshire / GB Opponent's representative Harrison Goddard Foote Belgrave Hall Belgrave Street Leeds LS2 8DD / GB | |||
Former [2000/45] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
07.09.2000
Machery, Nagel GmbH & Co. KG Valencienner Strasse 11 52313 Düren / DE Opponent's representative Paul, Dieter-Alfred, Dipl.-Ing. Fichtestrasse 18 41464 Neuss / DE | ||
02
15.09.2000
WITHDRAWN Cobra Therapeutics Limited The Science Park University of Keele KEELE ST5 5SP Staffordshire / GB Opponent's representative Harrison Goddard Foote Tower House, Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | |||
Former [2000/44] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
07.09.2000
ADMISSIBLE Machery, Nagel GmbH & Co. KG Valencienner Strasse 11 52313 Düren / DE Opponent's representative Paul, Dieter-Alfred, Dipl.-Ing. Fichtestrasse 18 41464 Neuss / DE | 21.09.2000 | No. 01: Notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition | 30.09.2000 | No. 01: Reply to notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition | 09.11.2000 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 23.05.2001 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 07.08.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M06) | 17.02.2003 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 07.11.2003 | Date of oral proceedings | 20.01.2004 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 20.01.2004 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 28.03.2006 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2007/03] | Appeal following opposition | 04.03.2004 | Appeal received No. T0652/04 | 01.06.2004 | Statement of grounds filed | 28.03.2006 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent withdrawn | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JPS5813519 ; | [A]US4997932 (REARDON MELISSA A [US], et al) [A] 1,11,14,15,17 * example -; claim - *; | [A]WO9311221 (DIAGEN GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,11,14,15,17 * figure -; example -; claim - * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 83, no. 10, Database accession no. 83-23220, & JPS5813519 A 19830126 (SEIKAGAKU KOGYO KK) [A] 1,11,14,15,17 * abstract * |