EP0745141 - WATER-PROOFING PROCESS FOR LEATHERS AND PELTS BY COMB-LIKE CARBOXYLATED POLYSILOXANES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.09.1998 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 30.07.2008 [2008/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | [2008/31] |
Former [1996/49] | For all designated states BASF AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KNEIP, Michael Erzbergerstrasse 30 D-67227 Frankenthal / DE | 02 /
DANISCH, Peter An der Mittagsweide 123 D-67065 Ludwigshafen / DE | [1996/49] | Application number, filing date | 95908266.0 | 06.02.1995 | [1996/49] | WO1995EP00418 | Priority number, date | DE19944404890 | 16.02.1994 Original published format: DE 4404890 | [1996/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9522627 | Date: | 24.08.1995 | [1995/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0745141 | Date: | 04.12.1996 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.08.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0745141 | Date: | 19.11.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.09.1995 | Classification | IPC: | C14C9/00, C08L83/06 | [1996/49] | CPC: |
C14C9/00 (EP,US);
C08L83/06 (EP,US);
C08L83/08 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08L83/06, C08L2666/26 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, PT [1996/49] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM HYDROPHOBIEREN VON LEDER UND PELZFELLEN MIT KAMMARTIG CARBOXYLFUNKTIONALISIERTEN POLYSILOXANEN | [1996/49] | English: | WATER-PROOFING PROCESS FOR LEATHERS AND PELTS BY COMB-LIKE CARBOXYLATED POLYSILOXANES | [1996/49] | French: | PROCEDE D'IMPERMEABILISATION DE CUIRS ET DE PEAUX AVEC DES POLYSILOXANES A FONCTION CARBOXYLE ET A STRUCTURE EN PEIGNE | [1996/49] | Entry into regional phase | 31.07.1996 | National basic fee paid | 31.07.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.07.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.09.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 31.07.1996 | Examination requested [1996/49] | 20.03.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.05.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.06.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 26.06.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.08.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 19.11.1997 | BE | 28.02.1998 | [2002/32] |
Former [1999/27] | BE | 28.02.1998 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0205096 (SUNSTAR ENGINEERING INC [JP]); | [AD]EP0213480 (BASF AG [DE]) [AD] 1,5,7 * abstract *; | [A]EP0324345 (BASF AG [DE]) [A] 1,5,7 * page 3, lines 41-51 *; | [A]EP0556740 (WACKER CHEMIE GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * page 6, lines 15-26 * * page 6, lines 40-42 * |