EP0740697 - ENZYMES FOR RECREATIONAL WATER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.02.2004 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.04.2005 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 08.06.2005 [2005/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BUCKMAN LABORATORIES INTERNATIONAL, INC. 1256 McLean Boulevard Memphis TN 38108-0305 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2003/17] | For all designated states BUCKMAN LABORATORIES INTERNATIONAL, INC. 1256 McLean Boulevard Memphis TN 38108-0305 / US | ||
Former [1996/45] | For all designated states BUCKMAN LABORATORIES INTERNATIONAL, INC. 1256 North McLean Boulevard Memphis TN 38108-0305 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JAQUESS, Percy P.O. Box 59 Tigrett, TN 38070 / US | 02 /
DEL CORRAL, Fernando 6873 Hickory Lake Cove Memphis, TN 38119 / US | [1996/45] | Representative(s) | Matthews, Derek Peter Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/45] | Matthews, Derek Peter Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | Application number, filing date | 95908556.4 | 06.01.1995 | [1996/45] | WO1995US00685 | Priority number, date | US19940184108 | 21.01.1994 Original published format: US 184108 | [1996/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9520033 | Date: | 27.07.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0740697 | Date: | 06.11.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.07.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0740697 | Date: | 23.04.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.07.1995 | Classification | IPC: | C11D3/386, C11D3/20 | [1996/45] | CPC: |
C11D3/2065 (EP,US);
C11D3/2079 (EP,US);
C11D3/2082 (EP,US);
C11D3/38627 (EP,US);
C11D3/38663 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1996/45] | Extension states | LT | 16.08.1996 | SI | 16.08.1996 | Title | German: | ENZYME FÜR ERHOLUNGSBAD | [1996/45] | English: | ENZYMES FOR RECREATIONAL WATER | [1996/45] | French: | ENZYMES POUR EAUX DE BAINS RECREATIFS | [1996/45] | Entry into regional phase | 16.08.1996 | National basic fee paid | 16.08.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.08.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.08.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 16.08.1996 | Examination requested [1996/45] | 21.05.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.03.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.07.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.02.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 30.04.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.04.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.11.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.08.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.03.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.06.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 10.10.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 28.10.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.02.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 03.02.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.01.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/16] | Request for further processing for: | 30.04.1999 | Request for further processing filed | 05.05.1999 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 21.06.1999 | Decision despatched | 17.03.1998 | Request for further processing filed | 17.03.1998 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request deemed not to be filed | 07.04.1998 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 09.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.1997 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   23.04.1997 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 23.04.2003 | LI | 23.04.2003 | NL | 23.04.2003 | DK | 23.07.2003 | GR | 23.07.2003 | IE | 06.01.2004 | LU | 06.01.2004 | [2005/23] |
Former [2005/03] | CH | 23.04.2003 | |
LI | 23.04.2003 | ||
NL | 23.04.2003 | ||
DK | 23.07.2003 | ||
GR | 23.07.2003 | ||
IE | 06.01.2004 | ||
Former [2004/23] | CH | 23.04.2003 | |
LI | 23.04.2003 | ||
NL | 23.04.2003 | ||
DK | 23.07.2003 | ||
GR | 23.07.2003 | ||
Former [2004/02] | CH | 23.04.2003 | |
LI | 23.04.2003 | ||
NL | 23.04.2003 | ||
GR | 23.07.2003 | ||
Former [2004/01] | CH | 23.04.2003 | |
LI | 23.04.2003 | ||
NL | 23.04.2003 | Cited in | International search | [DA]US4305837 (KAMINSKY GEORGE J, et al) [DA] 1-6,9,13-18,21* the whole document *; | [DA]US4548727 (SHAER ELIAS H [US]) [DA] 1-4,9-17,20-23 * claim - *; | [DA]EP0352244 (NOVO NORDISK AS [DK], et al) [DA] 1-4,9,13-16,21 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0376705 (UNILEVER PLC [GB], et al) [X] 1,3,4,7-10,13,15,16,19-22 * the whole document * | Examination | WO9504808 | WO9507970 |