04.01.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.02.2008 [2008/06] |
29.09.2006 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.11.2006 [2006/44] |
06.08.2004 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.09.2004 [2004/39] |
05.12.2003 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.01.2004 [2004/04] |
19.09.2003 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.11.2003 [2003/45] |
07.03.2003 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.04.2003 [2003/17] |
11.01.2003 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.02.2003 [2003/09] |
04.01.2003 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.02.2003 [2003/08] |
27.12.2002 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.02.2003 [2003/06] |
15.11.2002 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.01.2003 [2003/01] |
18.10.2002 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.12.2002 [2002/49] |
11.10.2002 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.11.2002 [2002/48] |
13.09.2002 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 30.10.2002 [2002/44] |
09.05.2002 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.06.2002 [2002/26] |
21.09.2001 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 07.11.2001 [2001/45] |
10.08.2001 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
27.04.2001 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
27.04.2001 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
02.02.2001 |
Renewal fee |
|
01.02.2001 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
28.06.2000 |
Examination report or reply |
|
16.02.2000 |
Examination report or reply |
|
02.02.2000 |
Renewal fee |
|
11.02.1999 |
Examination report or reply |
|
11.02.1999 |
Renewal fee |
|
22.09.1998 |
Examination report or reply |
|
29.04.1998 |
Examination report or reply |
|
09.02.1998 |
Renewal fee |
|
15.01.1998 |
Examination report or reply |
|
15.12.1997 |
Examination report or reply |
|
12.07.1997 |
Examination report or reply |
|
07.05.1997 |
Examination report or reply |
|
06.02.1997 |
Renewal fee |
|
24.12.1996 |
Examination report or reply |
|
24.12.1996 |
First examination report |
|
07.06.1996 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 24.07.1996 [1996/30] |
07.06.1996 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 24.07.1996 [1996/30] |
25.05.1996 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
23.05.1996 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
15.05.1996 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|